Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pike, Zackery, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Costa, Esq., Matthew J, against Amego, Inc., represented by Weil, Esq., Steven David, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2023 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
This complaint is a request to establish title by adverse possession. The plaintiff, Zackery Pike, claims ownership of the real estate located at 276 New Taunton Avenue, Norton, Bristol County, Massachusetts. He holds a deed to the property dated Sep...
Answer with a counterclaim Applies To: Amego, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: December 04, 2023Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Zackery Pike
Date: December 20, 2023Defendant Amego, Inc.'s Cross Motion for Preliminary Injunction.
Date: December 14, 2023Opposition to to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amego, Inc.
Date: December 14, 2023Amego, Inc.'s Counterclaim filed.
Date: December 04, 2023Received from Defendant Pike, Zackery: Answer to the Counterclaim;
Date: December 15, 2023Plaintiff(s) Zackery Pike's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction
Date: November 14, 2023Affidavit of Ericka L. Murray.
Date: November 14, 2023Plaintiff(s) Zackery Pike's Motion for Short Order of Notice.
Date: November 14, 2023Affidavit OF Thomas R. Murray.
Date: November 14, 2023Affidavit of Zackery Pike.
Date: November 14, 2023Affidavit of Trina Rostron.
Date: November 14, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: November 14, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: November 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM & ORDER: ON CROSS=MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant's Cross-Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED. Judge: White, Jr., Hon. William M | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Zackery Pike | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Pike, Zackery: Answer to the Counterclaim; | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 12/21/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. William M White, Jr., Presiding Staff: Garrett Fregault, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV C, Court Reporter | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Amego, Inc.'s Cross Motion for Preliminary Injunction. | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amego, Inc. | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer with a counterclaim Applies To: Amego, Inc. (Defendant) | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Amego, Inc.'s Counterclaim filed. | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Amego, Inc.'s Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 11/30/2023 02:00 PM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#10.0): ALLOWED by agreement. Judge: Unassigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.