Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Neel, Jason, Rushmyfile, Inc., United States Real Estate Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Davidson, Thornton, against Cna Equities Group, Llc, Rushmyfile, Schwartz, Donald Esq, United States Real Estate Corporation, represented by Beuselinck, Michael Thomas, Perez, Jacoby Ryan, Pro Se, Smith, Edward Egan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Plaintiff Jason Neel against several defendants. The complaint alleges various claims and seeks relief for the following:
1. Cancellation of a $439,000 deed of trust.
2. Cancellation of a $35,000 deed of t...
Schwartz USREC Anti-SLAPP Notice Dismissal01
Date: April 22, 2024Neel Opposition
Date: April 11, 2024jneel.Opp AntiSlapp Mtn - Mark Dec.
Date: April 09, 2024jneel.Opp AntiSlapp Mtn - POS
Date: April 09, 2024jneel.Opp AntiSlapp Mtn - Smith Dec.
Date: April 09, 2024jneel.Opp AntiSlapp Mtn - MPA
Date: April 09, 2024Opposition to 4.3.24 Ex Parte to Continue Trial
Date: April 03, 2024jneel.Prop.Order re Ex Parte Continue Trial
Date: April 02, 2024jneel.POS Ex Parte
Date: April 02, 2024jneel.Smith Decl iso Ex Parte Continue Trial
Date: April 02, 2024jneel.Ex Parte App.MPA Continue Trial
Date: April 02, 2024A Schwartz Neel Stipulation SLAPP-merged
Date: February 22, 2024A Schwartz USREC Anti-SLAPP MPA01
Date: February 13, 2024A USREC Anti-SLAPP Schwartz Dec01
Date: February 13, 2024A USREC Anti-SLAPP Notice and Motion01
Date: February 13, 2024jneel.POS 010 Summons Roe 25-Schwartz
Date: January 29, 2024jneel.Amendment to Cross-Complaint Roe 25
Date: January 26, 2024jneel.Opp EPA Pref.Trial Setting w.exhs
Date: December 11, 2023First Amended Summons
Date: October 11, 2022Signed First Amended Complaint
Date: October 11, 2022scan0015
Date: October 25, 2022Declaration of Non-Monetary Status_Final
Date: October 25, 2022Final Objection to Non-Monetary Status
Date: November 04, 2022P-Answer [POS] [for filing]
Date: November 28, 2022P-Answer [for filing]
Date: November 28, 2022cm110 Case Management Statement 121422 [for filing]
Date: November 28, 2022jneel.CM Stmt
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance [for filing]
Date: November 30, 2022jneel.Notice of Remote Appear
Date: November 30, 2022NEEL NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: November 30, 2022CMS_NEEL_FINAL
Date: December 03, 2022RA NOTICE_NEEL_FINAL
Date: December 03, 2022RA NOTICE_NEEL_FINAL (1)
Date: December 05, 2022CMC 12.14.22
Date: December 06, 2022Jury fee deposit
Date: December 13, 2022Summons Cross-Complaint
Date: December 13, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: December 13, 2022Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: December 13, 2022jneel.Ntc Further CMC-TSC
Date: December 14, 2022Answer USREC XC
Date: January 13, 2023scanner@selectsharp.com_20230113_155950
Date: January 13, 2023jneel.SOP POS Rushmyfile
Date: January 17, 2023jneel.SOP POS Cody Molica
Date: January 17, 2023mx quash combined
Date: February 25, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE ESERvice3.2.23
Date: March 03, 2023mx to quash decl
Date: March 03, 2023mx to quash memo
Date: March 03, 2023motion to quash notice
Date: March 03, 2023mx to quash memo
Date: March 13, 2023motion to quash NX
Date: March 13, 2023FILE pos e serve mx quash sum
Date: March 13, 2023mx to quash decl
Date: March 13, 2023mx to quash memo
Date: March 14, 2023FILE pos e serve mx quash sum
Date: March 14, 2023mx to quash decl
Date: March 14, 2023motion to quash notice
Date: March 14, 2023Cross-Complaint
Date: March 19, 2023Answer by Rushmyfile to X-Cmpt of USREC
Date: March 19, 2023Answer by Rushmyfile to Complaint of Neel
Date: March 19, 2023Summons on Cross-Complaint
Date: March 19, 2023Summons (Typo Corrected)
Date: March 21, 2023jneel.Ntc Remote Appearance - MWD
Date: April 04, 2023jneel.Order re Remote Appearance - MWD
Date: April 04, 2023P-Answer Rushmyfile XC
Date: April 19, 20234.28.23 Request to Redact Final
Date: May 04, 2023NC Redacted Document_Redacted
Date: May 04, 2023jneel.Walton Decl iso USREC opp mtn to quash
Date: May 11, 2023jneel.Opp iso USREC opp mtn to quash
Date: May 11, 2023jneel.MWD Decl iso USREC opp mtn to quash
Date: May 11, 2023JNEEL.pos OPP USREC mtn quash summons
Date: May 11, 2023Redacted civ010 (GAL) Final
Date: May 16, 2023Unredated civ010 (GAL) Final
Date: May 16, 2023doc01716820230515150355
Date: May 16, 2023reply memo
Date: May 19, 2023proof of service electronic
Date: May 19, 2023FILE DECL. B molica
Date: May 20, 2023FILE decl. re timeliness of reply filing
Date: May 20, 2023FILE MOLICA REPLY DECL AND EXH A
Date: May 20, 2023REPLY mx to quash memo
Date: May 20, 2023proof of service electronic
Date: May 20, 2023FILE DECL R. molica
Date: May 20, 2023jneel.Notice Remote Appearance
Date: May 25, 2023jneel.PO Denying Molica Mtn
Date: May 25, 2023jneel.Order Re Remote Appearance
Date: May 25, 2023RA-10
Date: May 25, 2023RA-20
Date: May 25, 2023jneel.NOTEO DenyMolicaMtnQuashSummons
Date: May 30, 2023jneel.Association of Counsel
Date: May 31, 2023CMC Statement Rushmyfile on Neel Case
Date: June 12, 2023Neel v. SLS - CMC 6.20.23
Date: June 15, 2023jneel.Notice of Entry of Default - Cody Molica
Date: June 28, 2023Discovery Motion Pt. 1 7-31-23
Date: August 02, 2023Stipulated Protective Order
Date: August 03, 2023Discovery Motion Pt. 2 of 3 7-31-23
Date: August 08, 2023Discovery Motion Pt. 3 of 3 7-31-23
Date: August 08, 2023Notice of Non Opposition
Date: September 05, 2023Declaration of Brandi Jones
Date: September 08, 2023Proposed Order in
Date: September 16, 2023Proposed Order in WORD.docx
Date: September 16, 2023Proposed Order without Form Cover Sheet
Date: September 18, 2023Req Dismissal - SLS Only
Date: October 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV01758 NEEL v. SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING, et al. DEFENDANT UNITED STATES REAL ESTATE CORP’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL The motion to continue trial is granted. While Defendant contends it has further e... | |
April 23, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV01758 NEEL v. SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING, et al. DEFENDANT UNITED STATES REAL ESTATE CORP’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL The motion to continue trial is granted. While Defendant contends it has further e... | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Schwartz USREC Anti-SLAPP Notice Dismissal01 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Cross Defendant, Defendant Schwartz, Donald ESQ |
|
April 22, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV01758 NEEL v. SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING, et al. DEFENDANT UNITED STATES REAL ESTATE CORP’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL The motion to continue trial is granted. While Defendant contends it has further e... | |
April 21, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV01758 NEEL v. SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING, et al. DEFENDANT UNITED STATES REAL ESTATE CORP’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL The motion to continue trial is granted. While Defendant contends it has further e... | |
April 20, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 22CV01758 NEEL v. SUPERIOR LOAN SERVICING, et al. DEFENDANT UNITED STATES REAL ESTATE CORP’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL The motion to continue trial is granted. While Defendant contends it has further e... | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
170.6 Disqualification Granted (Judicial Officer: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky) Filing Party: Cross Defendant, Defendant Schwartz, Donald ESQ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.