Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kopitnik, Thomas, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mason, Andrew B, against Clearview Property Services Inc, Hulme, Christopher, represented by Dyriam, Sita, Dyriam, S Joanna, Fix, Sheila E, Mardyrosian, Linet, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Motion to Compel, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Response, Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: January 18, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Answer, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: November 09, 202152993PLAIN00bda5
Date: February 04, 202253042DEFEN0033e2
Date: February 04, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 18, 202259050DECLA04aa95
Date: June 15, 202259050DECLA03eddf
Date: June 15, 202259050PLAIN0158e3
Date: June 15, 202259050PLAIN02469b
Date: June 15, 202259050PLAIN0044b2
Date: June 15, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 07, 202259116DEFEN0354f2
Date: June 16, 202259116DEFEN02e058
Date: June 16, 202259116DEFEN013166
Date: June 16, 202259116DEFEN0044ec
Date: June 16, 202259332PLAIN0053a4
Date: June 21, 202259331Plain004785
Date: June 21, 202259255DEFEN01aef9
Date: June 20, 202259341NOTIC0056b4
Date: June 21, 202259255DEFEN0038b9
Date: June 20, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: June 28, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Complaint, Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Demurrer, Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Demurrer
Date: October 12, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: October 12, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: September 10, 202164060NOTIC001515
Date: September 28, 2022Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 21, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: June 02, 2022Response, Filed
Date: June 20, 2022Response, Filed
Date: June 20, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: June 28, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Motion: Summary Adjudication
Date: October 18, 202264407DECLA016a8d
Date: October 05, 202264407DEFEN004773
Date: October 05, 202264407DECLA044f06
Date: October 05, 202264407DECLA057587
Date: October 05, 202264407DEFEN0292f1
Date: October 05, 202264407DEFEN03d67b
Date: October 05, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Response, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: October 04, 202264577Defen007aeb
Date: October 07, 2022Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Motion: Bifurcation
Date: November 01, 202264870PLAIN03a109
Date: October 13, 202264870PLAIN01361d
Date: October 13, 202264870PLAIN025fc3
Date: October 13, 202264870PLAIN04129e
Date: October 13, 202264870PLAIN003a76
Date: October 13, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 18, 202265457SECON016d0c
Date: October 25, 202265649NOTIC00870a
Date: October 28, 202266343Decla03abef
Date: November 14, 202266343Separ042720
Date: November 14, 202266343Plain00463d
Date: November 14, 202266343Plain020ccd
Date: November 14, 202266426Decla01c24f
Date: November 15, 202266426Separ047bbf
Date: November 15, 202266426Plain004063
Date: November 15, 202266426Plain02c399
Date: November 15, 202266998Answe00323a
Date: November 29, 202266998Reque018ae7
Date: November 29, 202266998Motio03f49e
Date: November 29, 202267148Oppos0012bd
Date: December 01, 202267148Separ014faf
Date: December 01, 202267422PLAIN01bb89
Date: December 06, 202267422DECLA00b75d
Date: December 06, 202268069PLAIN004b25
Date: December 20, 202268262DECLA03f3be
Date: December 22, 202268262DECLA0427a3
Date: December 22, 202268262PLAIN02a709
Date: December 22, 202268251NOTIC001d03
Date: December 22, 202268262PLAIN00e69f
Date: December 22, 202268262PLAIN01ebbc
Date: December 22, 202268340DEFEN00df4b
Date: December 23, 202269891Reque0031f8
Date: January 26, 202370074Notic00bca8
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
January 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Demurrer and Motion to Strike The court has detailed the history of this case in previous orders and will not recount that history here. Suffice it to say that after the court d...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 70074Notic00bca8 | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 69891Reque0031f8 | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 68340DEFEN00df4b | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 68262DECLA03f3be | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 68262DECLA0427a3 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 68262PLAIN02a709 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 68251NOTIC001d03 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 68262PLAIN00e69f |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.