Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Leet, William Carlos, Ryan, Jeffrey F., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lapcevic, William A., against Does 1-10, Leet, William Carlos, represented by Leet, William Carlos, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 19, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 19, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 19, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 19, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 19, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 18, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 19, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2021Amended Notice Of
Date: December 22, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 02, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 07, 2022Complaint
Date: August 17, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: January 28, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2021Demurrer to Cross-Complaint
Date: November 19, 2021Order
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration
Date: October 12, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 21, 2021Exhibit List
Date: September 15, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: September 15, 2021Exhibit to Complaint
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 15, 2021Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 Against
Date: September 14, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: September 14, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 14, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 15, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: August 30, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Demurrer to Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: June 12, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 22, 2023Order
Date: February 24, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: March 15, 2023Motion for Leave to File
Date: March 15, 2023PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: February 22, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: February 15, 2022Order
Date: July 13, 2023Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues
Date: June 13, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 07, 2022Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: April 26, 2023Stipulation & Order
Date: May 26, 2023Exhibit List
Date: April 24, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: February 22, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: April 24, 2023Separate Statement
Date: February 22, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 22, 2023Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: June 02, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 21, 2023Order
Date: April 21, 2023Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: April 14, 2022PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: April 18, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: March 21, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 07, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: February 14, 2023Pretrial Order
Date: February 14, 2023Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: December 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 08, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: February 15, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: May 23, 2023Exhibits submitted in support of
Date: February 22, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 22, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: February 22, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: February 14, 2023Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 04, 2022ADR Referral
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 07, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Related Case
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 30, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 30, 2023Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: April 18, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 06, 2023Answer
Date: March 02, 2022Order
Date: February 24, 2022PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: February 22, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 17, 2021DEMURRER OPP RYAN v LEET FV
Date: January 28, 2022MOT STRIKE PUN OPP 012622 FV
Date: January 28, 20222022.02.07 Relpy ISO Demurrer
Date: February 07, 20222022.02.07 Reply ISO MTS
Date: February 07, 20222022.03.07 Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 07, 20222022.03.08 CMS for CMC on 2022.03.21
Date: March 08, 2022HRG 03-25-22 CMS Ryan v. Leet FV
Date: March 11, 20222022.04.11 ADR Stip and PROPOSED Order
Date: April 11, 2022mc050 substitution of attorney FV
Date: August 04, 20222022.11.15 Statement of Nonagreement
Date: November 15, 20222023.02.08 Joint CMS for CMC on 2023.02.14
Date: February 08, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - Index of Exhibits
Date: February 23, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - Separate Statement
Date: February 23, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - POS
Date: February 23, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - MPA
Date: February 23, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - Notice of MSJ
Date: February 23, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - Index of Exhibits r
Date: February 23, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - RFJN
Date: February 23, 20232023.02.22 MSJ - PROPOSED ORDER
Date: February 23, 2023Ex A--1st Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: March 15, 2023Motion to Amend MPA FV
Date: March 15, 2023Reply re Motion to Amend FV
Date: April 06, 20232023.04.05 Pltfs Oppo to Def's Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: April 06, 20232023.04.05 Pltfs Oppo to Def's Motion for Leave to Amend - POS
Date: April 06, 20232023.04.05 Pltfs Oppo to Def's Motion for Leave to Amend - RFJN
Date: April 06, 2023Exhibits 1st Amded Cross Comp FV
Date: April 18, 2023PROPOSED ORDER ON MOT TO AMEND RYAN V. LEET FV
Date: April 18, 2023Proposed Order Cover sheet Ryan Mot to Amd
Date: April 18, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons Geisler FV
Date: April 18, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons Zischke FV
Date: April 18, 20231st Amended Verified Cross-Complaint FV
Date: April 18, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons Flemming FV
Date: April 18, 2023Exhibits 1st Amded Cross Comp FV
Date: April 24, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons Geisler FV
Date: April 24, 20231st Amended Verified Cross-Complaint FV
Date: April 24, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons Zischke FV
Date: April 24, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons Flemming FV
Date: April 24, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons all defs FV
Date: April 25, 2023sum110 Cross-Complaint Summons all defs FV
Date: April 26, 20232023.05.23 Stipulation and [PROPOSED] Order to Sorten Time
Date: May 23, 2023MSJ OPP 052323 FV
Date: May 23, 2023Opp Partys SSUF 052323 FV
Date: May 23, 2023Index and Exhs Opp to Ryan MSA FV
Date: May 23, 2023Leet Decl 052323 FV
Date: May 23, 20232023.05.25 Decl of WAL re Meet and Confer
Date: May 25, 20232023.05.30- Reply ISO MSJ - MPA
Date: May 30, 20232023.05.30 - Reply ISO MSJ - Obj to Evidence
Date: May 30, 20232023.05.30 - Reply ISO MSJ - POS
Date: May 30, 20232023.05.30 Reply ISO MSJ - Separate Statement
Date: May 30, 2023Not. and Acknl. of Recpt. Flemming 230515
Date: June 02, 2023Not. and Acknl. of Recpt. Geisler 230515
Date: June 02, 2023FINAL Zischke MPA iso Demurrer
Date: June 12, 2023FINAL Zischke Demurrer
Date: June 12, 2023FINAL Zischke TJD Decl iso Demurrer
Date: June 12, 2023FINAL Zischke RFJN iso Demurrer
Date: June 12, 2023FINAL Zischke Notice of Demurrer
Date: June 12, 2023FINAL Proposed Order Granting Demurrer
Date: June 12, 2023FINAL Zischke AMENDED Notice of Demurrer
Date: June 14, 20232023.08.07 - Request for Dismissal - SIGNED
Date: August 08, 2023POS - SIGNED
Date: August 08, 2023civ110 Req for dismissal of Cross Comp FV
Date: August 30, 20232023.04.05 Pltfs Oppo to Def's Motion for Leave to Amend - Index of Exhibits
Date: April 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice CROSS COMPLAINT WILLIAM CARLOS LEET Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice CROSS COMPLAINT WILLIAM CARLOS LEET |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | civ110 Req for dismissal of Cross Comp FV | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial seven days Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal after 664.6 | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.08.07 - Request for Dismissal - SIGNED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | POS - SIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.