Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Coria Juan, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Hershey Brennan M., Hershey Brennan Michael, against Industrial Field Services Inc., represented by Bowles Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management135 days |
Filing DateMay 27, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: May 27, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Final Ruling-Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 14, 2022Order for Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Juan Coria (Plaintiff); As to: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 27, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2020Complaint
Date: May 27, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DEFENDANT
Date: August 17, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND FILING AND SERVICE DATE
Date: September 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 10, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 11, 2020Answer
Date: November 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: October 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 18, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 23, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: March 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: April 11, 2022Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: April 18, 2022Order - FINAL RULING-MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 04, 2022Trial Brief
Date: June 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 16, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANISKA CORONADO IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2022Order - ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 14, 2022Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] CORRECTED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Order (for Entry of Judgment) Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Status ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Filing and Service Date) Filed by Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to compel Plaintiff's deposit...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Receipt of Declaration and Propose...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Final Ruling-Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DEFENDANT) Filed by Juan Coria (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: July 14, 2022Answer Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Industrial Field Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Brennan Michael Hershey (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DEFENDANT)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice (JOINT REPORT FOR COURT'S TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Status ...))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF TIMOTHY BOWLES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to compel Plaintiff's deposit...))
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (JOINT REPORT FOR COURT'S POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Final Ruling-Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Filing and Service Date)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Filing and Service Date)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DEFENDANT)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice (JOINT REPORT FOR COURT'S TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Status ...))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (JOINT REPORT FOR COURT'S POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.