Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nationwide Indemnity Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Alikin Albert K., against St. Paul Fire And Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, represented by Davitt Vincent, Lee Grace Chen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Ann Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Ann Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management146 days |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions243 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 13, 2023Separate Statement; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: DIANE KORBISCH (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 26, 2020Complaint
Date: February 26, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 04, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: March 09, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: March 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: March 10, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 12, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 20, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 06, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: May 01, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 01, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 05, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 29, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: June 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 09, 2020Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: September 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 21, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 25, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT ST. PAUL FIRE AN...)
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT ST. PAUL FIRE AN...)
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)
Date: November 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE ...)
Date: November 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE ...)
Date: November 12, 2020Answer
Date: November 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE BY DEFENDANT ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY OF POSTING JURY FEE
Date: December 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: January 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: January 14, 2022Separate Statement
Date: February 09, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 09, 2022Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 09, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MO...)
Date: February 15, 2022Order - ORDER ORDER ADVANCING HEAING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 16, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: March 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: March 21, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 23, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 14, 2022Separate Statement
Date: July 14, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 14, 2022Exhibit List
Date: July 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 30, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/30/2022
Date: August 30, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: September 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING SHARON...)
Date: September 21, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 04, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/04/2022
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: November 08, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADMI...)
Date: November 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE PURSUAN...)
Date: February 06, 2023Separate Statement
Date: February 10, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 10, 2023Separate Statement
Date: February 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: February 28, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 20, 2023Separate Statement
Date: March 20, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 20, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge) of )
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant St. Paul Fire an...))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re Redactions to Certain Portions in Motion to Disqualify Briefing)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance ...) of )
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance ...) of )
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order (ORDER ADVANCING HEAING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance ...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Protective Order)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Mo...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Plaint...))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Plaint...))
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY?S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice ( OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice ( OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing Date on Demurrer to Plaintiff Nationwide's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Hearing on Demurrer ...))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant St. Paul Fire an...))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant St. Paul Fire an...))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant St. Paul Fire an...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Corrected re Redactions to Certain Portions in Motion to Disqualify Briefing)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance ...))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance ...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re Redactions to Certain Portions in Motion to Disqualify Briefing)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice (by Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company of Posting Jury Fee)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Protective Order)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Order (ORDER ADVANCING HEAING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY?S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/07/2021)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Mo...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Plaint...))
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge) of 03/10/2020)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing Date on Demurrer to Plaintiff Nationwide's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant St. Paul Fire an...) of )
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant St. Paul Fire an...))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice ( OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice ( OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Hearing on Demurrer ...))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance ...))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant St. Paul Fire an...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Corrected re Redactions to Certain Portions in Motion to Disqualify Briefing)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Hearing on Demurrer ...) of )
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice (by Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company of Posting Jury Fee)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.