Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Hauenstein, Gary E, Hauenstein, Gwen J, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Edwards, William E, Jr, Safaie, Majid, Taylor, Lacy L, Stuart, Brian T, against Agazaryan, David, Agazaryan, Mehran, Baljian, Ara, Bmi Group Inc, Karkotsyan, Arman, (total of 7) See All represented by Pugh, Fay, Reiss, Saul, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Real Property (26) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges that the plaintiffs are the rightful owners of certain properties in Santa Barbara County, California. The defendants named in the complaint include an individual named Ara Baljian, a business entity called Le Phuque LLC, and N...
Hauenstein- Ntc of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: April 05, 2024Summons Issued, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: June 10, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Order to Show Cause, Filed
Date: August 04, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Demurrer
Date: February 08, 2022Mail Returned Undeliverable
Date: November 18, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Complaint Contract, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 01, 2021Order to Show Cause, Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Order, Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Order to Show Cause: Dismissal
Date: September 14, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: February 08, 2022Demurrer, Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: August 03, 2021Demurrer
Date: February 08, 2022RJN Ara - BMI REPLY
Date: February 01, 2022Demurrer to FAC Ara and LE REPLY
Date: February 01, 2022Motion to Strike portions of FAC BMI REPLY
Date: February 01, 2022Demurrer by BMI Notice of Non-Opposition
Date: February 01, 2022Motion to Strike Ara and LE REPLY
Date: February 01, 2022Proof of Service for Second Amended Complaint
Date: March 31, 2022hauenstein 2nd amended complaint rtf
Date: March 31, 2022Declaration 5-2-22
Date: May 02, 2022Proof of Service of Summons 4-20-2022
Date: May 11, 2022SOA_for_Gwen_w_POS
Date: July 05, 2022SOA_for_Gary_w_POS
Date: July 05, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: January 24, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 25, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Response, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 08, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 25, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Demurrer to SAC COVER
Date: July 06, 2022Motion to Strike Ara Le Phuque BMI COVER
Date: July 06, 2022RJN
Date: July 06, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Demurrer, Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: June 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Demurrer
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed
Date: June 10, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: February 08, 2022Oppo_to_SAC_Demurrer_w_POS
Date: September 20, 2022Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Proof of Service by Mail, Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: June 02, 2022Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: September 19, 2022Demurrer
Date: October 04, 2022Motion: Strike
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Demurrer to SAC REPLY
Date: September 26, 2022Motion to Strike REPLY
Date: September 26, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: September 26, 2022TAC_w_Exhibits_POS
Date: October 31, 2022Cross-Complaint 12-8-22
Date: December 09, 2022Answer to TAC
Date: December 09, 2022Answer_to_Cross_Complaint_w_POS
Date: January 06, 2023Motion to Compel FI 4-8-23
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel SI Gary by Baljian FINAL
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel FI Sep Stmt FINAL
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel RFP Le Phuque Gwen FINAL
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel RFP Le Phuque Gwen SEP STMT
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel RFP Gwen by Baljian 4-8-23
Date: April 12, 2023Declaration FINAL
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel RFP Gary by Baljian FINAL
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel RFP Gwen by Baljian SEP STMT
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel RFP Gary by Baljian SEP STMT
Date: April 12, 2023SUB OF ATTY-SIGNED
Date: April 21, 2023SUB OF ATTY as to X-Ds signed
Date: April 27, 2023Gary & Gwen Hauenstein- OPP to Ara Baljian's MsTC Resps
Date: May 24, 2023Separate Statement, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Separate Statement, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: June 06, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: June 06, 2023Separate Statement, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Answer, Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: June 06, 2023Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: April 27, 2023Opposition, Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: June 06, 2023Separate Statement, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: June 06, 2023Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Decl_of_Safaie_DL_iso_w_Ex_s_Bookmared_POS
Date: May 25, 2023Decl_of_BTS_w_Atta_A_POS
Date: May 25, 2023Combined Reply 5-26-23
Date: May 26, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Reply, Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Hauenstein v. Baljian Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 22, 2023CMC Stmt to File
Date: September 05, 2023Hauenstein- CMS (92523 CMC)
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Hauenstein- Ntc of Unavailability of Counsel | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hauenstein- CMS (92523 CMC) | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC Stmt to File | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hauenstein v. Baljian Notice of Unavailability | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel RFP Gwen by Baljian Motion: Compel Defendant Ara Baijian to Compel Plaintiff Gwen J. Hauenstein to Withdraw Her Untimely Objections, Provide A. Verification for Her Reponses and Provide Further Responses and Provie Further Responses to Demand for Production of Documents Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration/Affidavit Motion: Compel Plaintiff Gary R Hauenstein to Withdraw His Untimely Objections and Responses to Special Interrogs Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel SI Gary by Baljian Motion: Compel Defendant Ara Baijian to Compel Plaintiff Gary R. Hauenstein to Withdraw His Untimely Objections and Provide Responses to Special Interrogatories Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Motion: Compel and Motion by Defendant Le Phuque, LLC to Compel Plaintiff Gwen J. Hauenstein to Withdraw Her Untimely Objections and Provide Further Reponses to Demand for Production of Docs Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition Motion: Compel Defendant Ara Baijian to Compel Plaintiff Gary E. Hauenstein to Withdraw His Untimely Objections and Provide Further Responses to Demand for Production of Docs Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Combined Reply 5-26-23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.