Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aguirre Claudio R., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Paley Robin, against Buenrostro Osorio Maria Alma, Osorio Jose A., represented by Brifman Mark, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Stephen P. Pfahler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 11, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 11, 2020Complaint
Date: March 11, 2020Notice - RECORDED LIS PENDENS AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS
Date: June 18, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: July 31, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 17, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: August 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FEE WAIVER HEARING)
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER THAT FACTS ARE DEEMED ADMITTED
Date: February 22, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: February 25, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER
Date: March 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK BRIFMAN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED
Date: June 11, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 25, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 07, 2021Proof of Personal Service - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 11, 2021Separate Statement
Date: August 24, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 21, 2021Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: September 23, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 23, 2021Exhibit List
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: November 08, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: November 15, 2021Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER
Date: November 15, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 15, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 16, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 23, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 07, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK BRIFMAN IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))
Date: December 07, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: December 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE FOR DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY...)
Date: December 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 11, 2022Exhibit List
Date: February 18, 2022Witness List
Date: February 18, 2022Trial Brief
Date: February 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 24, 2022Witness List
Date: March 01, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR
Date: February 28, 2022Exhibit List
Date: March 01, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SETTLEMENT
Date: March 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (4 DAYS))
Date: March 07, 2022Motion for Stipulated Judgment
Date: July 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STIPULATED JUDGMENT)
Date: August 18, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 22, 2022Order - ORDER ON JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION
Date: August 22, 2022Judgment
Date: August 22, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 30, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: October 10, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Recorded Lis Pendens and Proof of Service of Recorded Lis Pendens
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Order to Set Aside / Vacate (Default)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default and File Answer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories as to Jose Osorio
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories as to Maria Osorio
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fee Waiver Hearing))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Errata)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice Of Motion For Order That Facts Are Deemed Admitted
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Mark Brifman in Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Reply (Brief)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Deem Facts Admitted
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Amended)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Hearing
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO SP...))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories by Defendant Jose A Osorio)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motions to Compel Further Responses
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Mark Brifman in Opposition to Motion to Strike Answer)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike for defendants' failure to comply...))
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/11/2022)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 01/11/2022)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions ag...))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re Settlement)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (re sanctions for failure to appear)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (4 days)))
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 17, 2020Order to Set Aside / Vacate - ORDER TO SET ASIDE / VACATE DEFAULT
Date: September 14, 2020Answer
Date: October 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 12, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 05, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: February 16, 2021Brief - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 24, 2021Reply - REPLY BRIEF
Date: April 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 08, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 11, 2021Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing and Order)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production and Inspection of Documents
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion (For Order That Facts Are Deemed Admitted)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.