Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brian F. Buchanan A Law Corporatuion Dba Buchanan & Patterson Llp, Kim Do Rim, Kim Do Woo, The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church In Los Angeles, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Friedman Jeremy, Kim Jae Soo, Lee Won Kee, Lee Yong Bom, Nakatsu David, (total of 6) See All against Cho Jong Soon, Cho Mary S. Aka Sang Nam Cho, Cho Yong Chul, Chu Nee Don, Han Hyun Jong, (total of 18) See All represented by Buchanan Brian F, Friedman Jeremy, Lee Won Kee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard E. Rico Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management463 days |
Filing DateMay 14, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Reply in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Declaration Marian K. Lee; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Declaration OF JUN SEO KIM; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration OF MICHA SHIM; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration OF UN YOUNG KIM; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration OF JAY W. CHO; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Turndown Letter NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00U B303666; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance NOA: B303521; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (NOA ) (U); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B303521; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Respondent)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Declaration OF NANCY W. CHO; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration OF HWANGBO SUNG; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration OF JAE SOO KIM; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Respondent)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Do Rim Kim; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Law Firm of J.S.Kim & Associates (Appellant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Declaration of Jae S. Kim; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Declaration OF DO RIM KIM IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA NO B#; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: May 14, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 14, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 22, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 28, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: May 30, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 10, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: June 20, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 21, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 15, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER
Date: August 01, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: July 26, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAY W. CHO
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY W. CHO
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLORIA KYUNG KIM
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUN SEO KIM
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOANNE SOOK KIM
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDEE HYUN YUN CHAE
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHA SHIM
Date: August 05, 2019Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF YOU CHUNG KIM
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF HWANGBO SUNG
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF KYUNG HEE KIM
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF WONY HEE WON JUNG
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF UN YOUNG KIM
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF SANG NAM CHO
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAE SUN SHIN
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUNG WON CHAE
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF EUNICE EUN HAENG KIM
Date: August 05, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 06, 2019Declaration of Do Rim Kim; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Appellant); Do Rim Kim (Appellant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Declaration OF HAE SUN SHIN; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration OF SANG NAM CHO; Filed by: The Wilton Korean Presbyterian Church in Los Angeles, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Declaration Brian F. Buchanan; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Declaration of Jae S. Kim; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff); Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Mandatory Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Motions; Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Do Rim Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Motion for an OSC Re: Contempt (CCP 1209); Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal N.O.A. B303521; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hyun Jong Han (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Do Woo Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B303666; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B303521; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: August 07, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 07, 2019Order - ORDER ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING
Date: August 14, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 22, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MUCHIN DEITKE
Date: August 22, 2019Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: August 27, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: August 29, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAE S KIM
Date: August 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STRIKING)
Date: August 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING, ALTERN...)
Date: September 03, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: September 03, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT 1ST
Date: September 03, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION
Date: September 06, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 06, 2019Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 19, 2019Order - ORDER ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING
Date: September 19, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: September 30, 2019Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: September 30, 2019Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: October 02, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DO RIM KIM
Date: October 03, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MUCHIN DEITKE
Date: October 03, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: October 08, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 18, 2019Order - ORDER ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING
Date: October 18, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 21, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 29, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: November 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 30, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2019
Date: October 30, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 06, 2019Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: November 07, 2019Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: November 07, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 07, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO THE TWO ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: November 07, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH
Date: November 12, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO AND REQUEST TO STRIKE THE AMENDED ANTI-SLAPP MOTION
Date: November 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 13, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 13, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 15, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DO RIM KIM IN SUPPORT
Date: November 15, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAE SOO KIM
Date: November 15, 2019Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: November 18, 2019Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: November 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 19, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION BRIAN F. BUCHANAN
Date: November 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER REGARDING SPECIAL E...)
Date: November 22, 2019Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: November 26, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 27, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO THE AMENDED AND ORIGINAL ANTI SLAPP MOTIONS
Date: November 27, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ANTI SLAPP MOTIONS REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MUCHIN DEITKE
Date: December 09, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 10, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)
Date: December 11, 2019Order - ORDER ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING
Date: December 11, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DO RIM KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ANTI-SLAPP MOTION
Date: August 16, 2019Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: August 16, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 16, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 06, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF HYUN JONG HAN IN SUPPORT
Date: January 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN F BUCHANAN IN SUPPORT
Date: January 08, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOON CHUL PARK IN SUPPORT
Date: January 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONG SOON CHO IN SUPPORT
Date: January 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIAN K LEE IN SUPPORT
Date: January 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF SANG NAM CHO AKA MARYS CHO IN SUPPORT
Date: January 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DO RIM KIM
Date: January 17, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAE S. KIM
Date: January 17, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 24, 2020Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 27, 2020Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - (AMENDED)
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - (AMENDED)
Date: January 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/30/2020
Date: January 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 31, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING
Date: January 31, 2020Order - ORDER COURT RULING
Date: January 31, 2020Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment) - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: August 21, 2020Separate Statement
Date: September 28, 2020Motion for an OSC Re: Contempt (CCP 1209)
Date: October 01, 2020Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B303521
Date: October 20, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 21, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 10, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: November 16, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERR...)
Date: December 04, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS
Date: February 10, 2021Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - 1/10/20 U B303666
Date: February 22, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"
Date: March 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 19, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B303666
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 30, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 28, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ON 4843 ROSEWOOD
Date: March 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ON 4938 MAPLEWOOD
Date: March 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ON 470 N ST ANDREWS
Date: March 09, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: October 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: October 28, 2019Order - ORDER ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING
Date: October 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 28, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 17, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANDEE HYUN YUN CHAE)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Status Confer...))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFFS? SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHA SHIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAY W. CHO)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF EUNICE EUN HAENG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Muchin Deitke)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF SUNG WON CHAE)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF HWANGBO SUNG)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAE S. KIM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF HAE SUN SHIN)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Do Rim Kim in Support of Defendants Anti-SLAPP Motion)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOANNE SOOK KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Grace Ran Seo in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAE SOO KIM)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Declaration ( of Muchin Deitke)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF DO RIM KIM IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Declaration ( of Do Rim Kim)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae Soo Kim RE: Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's [Amended] Anti-SLAPP)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER RE:TWO PENDING ANTI-SLAPP MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Declaration ( of Jae S. Kim)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To The Amended And Original Anti slapp Motions)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "R")
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Sang Nam Cho Aka Marys Cho in Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint by Nineteen DOE Defendants)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Do Rim Kim in Support of Defendant's [Amended] Anti-SLAPP)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Special Election Proceedings to Ele...))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS? DO WOO KIM and DO RIM KIM?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (NOA:)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF DO RIM KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Preliminary Injunction Motion)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration ( OF ANGIE IN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Opposition (to the Two Anti-Slapp Motions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (In Opposition to the Amended And Original Anti Slapp Motions)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Objection (to Preliminary Injunction Motion)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff?s Opposition to Defendants? Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Opposition ( TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Striking))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Declaration ( of Muchin Deitke)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Joon Chul Park In Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "U")
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER STRIKING, ALTERN...))
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Declaration (OF DO WOO KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (NOA:)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Objection (to and Request to Strike the Amended Anti-SLAPP Motion)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants' Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Answer (To First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. B303521)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Declaration ( OF JAE S KIM)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Hyun Jong Han In Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) ([Amended])
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN OPPOSITION TO THE TWO ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice (OF TRAIL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON IN CASE NUMBER 19STCP04605)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Regarding Special E...))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Declaration (Marian K. Lee)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Declaration ( of Do Rim Kim)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Order (COURT RULING)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian F Buchanan in Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (Brian F. Buchanan)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "R")
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "R"
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 27, 2020Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal
Date: March 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 27, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 23, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 23, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: March 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: March 30, 2020Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: April 02, 2020Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: April 08, 2020Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: May 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY CONTINUANCE)
Date: May 08, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 13, 2020Separate Statement
Date: July 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 05, 2020Declaration (Declaration of Do Rim Kim)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Marian K Lee in Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "U")
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R")
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jong Soon Cho In Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U")
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DATE FOR SPECIAL ELECTION PROCEEDING MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("U"; NOA:)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Anti Slapp Motions Requests for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("R"; NOA:)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U")
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of , TENTATIVE RULING AND COPY COURT'S RULING)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (NOA NO B#)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Mandatory Continuance))
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Mandatory Continuance) of )
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Default ("R")
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U")
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action on 470 N St Andrews)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action on 4843 Rosewood)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (NOA ) (U)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal ( U B303666)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A.10/08/19 B303521)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Mandatory Continuance) of 05/08/2020)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Mandatory Continuance))
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Fees Paid by Appellant ($782.98) (1 OR; 1 CC))
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 1/10/20, "R")
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA:10/08/19 B303521)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:10/08/19 B303521)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (the Deposition of Jae Hwan Cho and Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Motion for an OSC Re: Contempt (CCP 1209)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B303521)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS YOUNG CHUL CHO)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS HYUN JONG HAN)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of 12/03/2020)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE DEPARTMENT NUMBER FOR 20STCV38134)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interr...))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (1/10/20 U B303666)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U")
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motions)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B303666)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (NOA 01/10/20) (U)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/15/2019)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF WONY HEE WON JUNG)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARIAN K. LEE)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF HAE SUN SHIN)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF HWANGBO SUNG)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF UN YOUNG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF SUNG WON CHAE)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHA SHIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOANNE SOOK KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANDEE HYUN YUN CHAE)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JUN SEO KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF NANCY W. CHO)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF GLORIA KYUNG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF EUNICE EUN HAENG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAE S. KIM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF KYUNG HEE KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAY W. CHO)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF YOU CHUNG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFFS? SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Status Confer...))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Do Rim Kim in Support of Defendants Anti-SLAPP Motion)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Muchin Deitke)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF DO WOO KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF DO RIM KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration ( OF ANGIE IN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF JUN SEO KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF YOU CHUNG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF SANG NAM CHO)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARIAN K. LEE)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF WONY HEE WON JUNG)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF KYUNG HEE KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF UN YOUNG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF GLORIA KYUNG KIM)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF NANCY W. CHO)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Declaration ( OF JAE S KIM)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Striking))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER STRIKING, ALTERN...))
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Preliminary Injunction Motion)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Objection (to Preliminary Injunction Motion)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS? DO WOO KIM and DO RIM KIM?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Grace Ran Seo in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff?s Opposition to Defendants? Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Declaration ( of Muchin Deitke)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Declaration ( of Do Rim Kim)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:10/8/19)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/30/2019)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:10/8/19)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Opposition (to the Two Anti-Slapp Motions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN OPPOSITION TO THE TWO ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:10/8/19)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAE SOO KIM)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF DO RIM KIM IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:10/8/19)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER RE:TWO PENDING ANTI-SLAPP MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (Brian F. Buchanan)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (Marian K. Lee)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Do Rim Kim)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Regarding Special E...))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Anti Slapp Motions Requests for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration ( of Muchin Deitke)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants' Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice (OF TRAIL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON IN CASE NUMBER 19STCP04605)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DATE FOR SPECIAL ELECTION PROCEEDING MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Marian K Lee in Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Hyun Jong Han In Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Joon Chul Park In Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian F Buchanan in Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Jong Soon Cho In Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R")
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (NOA 10/8/19 NO B#)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration ( of Jae S. Kim)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:1/10/20; "U")
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U")
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:1/10/20; "R")
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Declaration ( of Do Rim Kim)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("U"; NOA:1/10/20)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("R"; NOA:1/10/20)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:1/10/20; "U")
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/30/2020)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:1/10/20; "R")
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Order (COURT RULING)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Special Election Proceedings to Ele...))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U")
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interr...))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B303521)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE DEPARTMENT NUMBER FOR 20STCV38134)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (the Deposition of Jae Hwan Cho and Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed , "R")
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B303521)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA: B303521)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Fees Paid by Appellant ($782.98) (1 OR; 1 CC))
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Motion for an OSC Re: Contempt (CCP 1209)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of )
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS YOUNG CHUL CHO)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS HYUN JONG HAN)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B303666)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action on 4938 Maplewood)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motions)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF SANG NAM CHO)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Opposition ( TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Do Rim Kim in Support of Defendant's [Amended] Anti-SLAPP)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae Soo Kim RE: Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's [Amended] Anti-SLAPP)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Objection (to and Request to Strike the Amended Anti-SLAPP Motion)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Answer (To First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) ([Amended])
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To The Amended And Original Anti slapp Motions)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (In Opposition to the Amended And Original Anti Slapp Motions)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Sang Nam Cho Aka Marys Cho in Support)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Default ("R")
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint by Nineteen DOE Defendants)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:10/8/19)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:10/8/19)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U")
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("R")
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA:10/08/19 B303521)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA 10/8/19 NO B#)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("R"; NOA:1/10/20)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("U"; NOA:1/10/20)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.