Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Polzin Jorge, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by King Tessa Mar, Reisner Adam Jason, Taylor Gregory, against The Regents Of The University Of California, represented by Chan Lyle, Lindegren Karl Robert, Rashe David James, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Williams Court Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management133 days |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions291 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff); As to: UCLA Health (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff); As to: UCLA Health (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Signed and Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Continuance of Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions PLAINTIFFS' SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: October 05, 2023Notice of Status Conference; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 14, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 14, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: March 01, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 01, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 13, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 14, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 05, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: May 17, 2019Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: June 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 29, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 13, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 18, 2019Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: September 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION
Date: November 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER)
Date: November 20, 2019Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 22, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION-JENNA
Date: November 27, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION-KARL
Date: November 27, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION-LYLE
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: December 02, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: December 02, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: December 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)
Date: December 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: December 05, 2019Answer
Date: December 13, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: January 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: April 22, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 07, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 07, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 07, 2020Exhibit List
Date: May 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 09, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: June 22, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: June 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: June 26, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 01, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 16, 2020Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: October 02, 2020Separate Statement
Date: October 02, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 02, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 02, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 25, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 25, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: December 18, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING FILING OF PROPOSED ORDER ON JANUARY 4, 2021
Date: January 04, 2021Trial Brief
Date: January 29, 2021Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF THE CASE
Date: January 29, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS PLAINTIFFS' SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: January 29, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: January 29, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: January 29, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: January 29, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: January 29, 2021Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST [PROPOSED] JOINT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 29, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS JOINT
Date: February 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 05, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 05, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COU...)
Date: February 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAYS))
Date: February 16, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: February 16, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 02, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff); As to: UCLA Health (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration declaration; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF THE CASE; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-100
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: April 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 02, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 20, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 03, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 04, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT EX PARTE HEARING
Date: June 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 04, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 07, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL)
Date: January 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: January 24, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: July 05, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST [PROPOSED] AMENDED JOINT
Date: July 15, 2022Witness List - WITNESS LIST AMENDED JOINT
Date: July 15, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 22, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 26, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 23, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 03, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/23/2023
Date: January 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 23, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: January 24, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE TRIAL READINESS)
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 09, 2023Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: April 19, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA)
Date: January 14, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 22, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 24, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 25, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 13, 2020Declaration (declaration) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case (PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF THE CASE) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Deposition)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFFS' SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance May 28, 2020 Heari...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Subpoena)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Disqualify Plaintiff's Cou...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for relief for the Court to h...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Relief from Waiver of Di...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (3-5 days))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at Final Status Conference) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Continuance) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Continuance) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Continuance of Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at Ex Parte Hearing) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Reopening Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at Final Status Conference) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Expenses After Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR THE COURT TO HEAR PLAINT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial Continuance) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Jenna Warden in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order compelling deposition of Defendant; and for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration ( of LMC in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Reply (Defendant The Regents of California's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Objection (TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 12/18/2020)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply to Defendant's Oral Argument at Plaintiff's MSA)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata Regarding Filing of Proposed Order on January 4, 2021)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S OTHER UNRELATED LEGAL ACTIONS)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion re: (for Relief From Waiver of Discovery Objections)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Exhibit List ([PROPOSED] JOINT EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFFS' SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case (PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF THE CASE)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at Final Status Conference)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Disqualify Plaintiff's Cou...))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (3-5 days)))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Continuance)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Relief from Waiver of Discovery Objections)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Relief from Waiver of Di...))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for relief for the Court to h...))
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice (of Defendant The Regent's Cancellation of Reserved Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR THE COURT TO HEAR PLAINT...))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Expenses After Failure t...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at Final Status Conference)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Trial Brief (DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at Ex Parte Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Motion re: (TO REOPEN THE DISCOVERY MOTION CUTOFF DATE ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Reopening Discovery))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Trial))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Continuance of Trial) of 01/12/2022)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of 07/07/2021)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff); Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Jorge Polzin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (declaration)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order))
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Karl Lindegren in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition-Jenna)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition-Lyle)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Deposition)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition-Karl)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/02/2019)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance May 28, 2020 Hearing Date of Def's Motion to Compel Depo)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance May 28, 2020 Heari...))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Declaration ( OF BARDIA AKHAVAN, ) ESQ. REGARDING THE MEDIATION ) COMPLETION DATE OF JANUARY 8, 2020)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Subpoena))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Lyle Chan ISO Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/14/2020)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE A...))
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/09/2020)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Deposition))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.