Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lindow, Robert, Tabatabai, Jeanne Turner, Tabatabai, Shahram, Maleksalehi, Nemat, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mcallister, Eric Charles, against Tabatabai, Jeanne Turner, Tabatabai, Shahram, represented by Hak, Tanzeel, Harris, Lesley, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2018 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice
Date: October 26, 2023MC040
Date: February 12, 2024POS
Date: January 26, 2022DemandExchange
Date: February 14, 2022MTC Order
Date: February 14, 2022POS
Date: February 18, 202253936Notic005999
Date: February 25, 2022Jud100
Date: February 26, 2022CIV100
Date: February 26, 2022Evidence Packet part 1
Date: February 26, 2022Evidence Packet part 2
Date: February 26, 2022579 Application
Date: March 09, 2022CIV100
Date: March 09, 2022Ex Parte Continue Trial
Date: March 09, 2022POS
Date: March 09, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 09, 202254504Reque005a9e
Date: March 09, 2022Evidence Packet Part 4
Date: March 09, 202254515Notic0050cc
Date: March 09, 2022JUD100
Date: March 09, 202254613Notic008f35
Date: March 11, 202254588ExPar00156d
Date: March 10, 202254588Memor018a94
Date: March 10, 202254588Reque0262f6
Date: March 10, 202254588Propo04a111
Date: March 10, 202254588Decla03cd87
Date: March 10, 202254588Proof050d9a
Date: March 10, 2022Evidence Packet part 1
Date: March 12, 2022Evidence Packet Part 3
Date: March 12, 2022Evidence Packet part 2
Date: March 12, 20222-22 Order
Date: March 15, 2022579 Application
Date: March 16, 2022POS
Date: March 15, 2022Ex Parte Continue Trial
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Association
Date: March 15, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 15, 2022Evidence Packet Part 4
Date: March 17, 2022CIV100
Date: March 17, 2022JUD100
Date: March 17, 2022Supp_Decl_of_Counsel_in_pp_to_continue_trial
Date: March 17, 2022Req_Jud_Notice_opt
Date: March 18, 2022Turner_s_Memo_of_P_As_in_Sub_Tabatabai_as_plt
Date: March 18, 2022Opposition (motionjudg)
Date: March 18, 2022Tabatabai Reply
Date: March 21, 202255082Reply002f76
Date: March 22, 202255082Reply019235
Date: March 22, 2022Second_Supplemental_Decl_ot_to_Continue_Trial
Date: March 23, 2022Reply to Lindow
Date: March 25, 2022Declaration Reply (Lesley)
Date: March 25, 2022Objection to Lindow
Date: March 25, 2022Tabatabai Objection
Date: March 28, 2022POS
Date: March 28, 202255395Suppl00619d
Date: March 28, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 28, 2022Ex Parte MotionGoodFaith
Date: March 28, 2022pos
Date: March 28, 2022Harris_Decl_in_Resp_to_T_Exparte_Appl_for_OST
Date: March 29, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: March 30, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 30, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 30, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: April 01, 2022Proposed Order ex parte
Date: April 01, 2022pos
Date: April 01, 2022Stip_to_Substitute_Tabatabai_for_Maleksalehi
Date: April 01, 202255665Propo001736
Date: April 02, 2022Supp_Decl_of_Counsel_in_on_to_Continue_trial
Date: April 01, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: April 04, 2022POS
Date: April 04, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 04, 2022Declaration_of_Counsel_H_parte_appl_for_OST
Date: April 05, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 07, 2022Notice Jan 31
Date: April 08, 2022Notice Feb 22
Date: April 08, 2022Notice May 27
Date: April 08, 2022April 4 Order
Date: April 11, 2022POS
Date: April 13, 202257115Joind002efa
Date: May 03, 2022Opp_to_Mot_for_GFS_Memo_of_P_A_
Date: May 04, 2022RJN_Opp_to_Mot_GFS_compressed_1
Date: May 04, 202257297Propo030e90
Date: May 06, 202257297Decla026ea3
Date: May 06, 202257297Memor016a9f
Date: May 06, 202257297ExPar004a75
Date: May 06, 202257297Proof042da0
Date: May 06, 202257424Notic00a656
Date: May 10, 2022ReplyLindow
Date: May 11, 2022ReplyTurner
Date: May 11, 202257579Reply00c7cc
Date: May 12, 2022CM110
Date: May 13, 2022CMC_statement_051222
Date: May 12, 2022Opposition
Date: June 08, 2022POS
Date: June 08, 2022Tabatabai Objection
Date: June 08, 202258890Appli00f0ee
Date: June 10, 2022Reply_in_Support_of_Turn_ent_on_the_Pleadings
Date: June 14, 2022Proof_of_Service
Date: June 14, 2022Stipulation to Continue Depositions
Date: July 20, 2022Proposed Order
Date: July 20, 202260688Appli002971
Date: July 21, 202260605Appli0057f7
Date: July 20, 202260605Notic014827
Date: July 20, 202260688Notic0159c2
Date: July 21, 2022Revised Malek Complaint
Date: July 22, 2022POS
Date: July 22, 2022pos
Date: July 22, 2022Sean MC040
Date: July 27, 202261515Notic00edf7
Date: August 05, 2022Opposition
Date: August 12, 2022RJN
Date: August 12, 2022POS
Date: August 12, 2022Supplemental Declaration
Date: August 25, 2022Supplemental Declaration
Date: August 29, 2022RJN copy
Date: August 29, 2022POS
Date: August 29, 2022MotionforSanctions
Date: August 29, 2022Aug 29 Order
Date: August 29, 2022Tabatabai_Proposed_Order_granting_JOP
Date: September 08, 2022Ltr_to_Court_re_order_granting_JOP
Date: September 08, 2022Memorandum_of_Costs
Date: September 12, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Order_Granting_JOP
Date: September 22, 2022Tabatabai Objection (MFS)
Date: October 03, 2022Judgment
Date: October 04, 202210-6 Order
Date: October 06, 2022CIV130
Date: October 10, 2022APP-002
Date: October 26, 2022Proof of Sevrvice
Date: October 26, 202266634Proof05bc45
Date: November 18, 202266634Memor019d21
Date: November 18, 202266634Notic009502
Date: November 18, 202266634Propo049af6
Date: November 18, 202266634Decla02afb2
Date: November 18, 202266634Propo039e43
Date: November 18, 2022Resp_Notice_of_Designating_Record_on_Appeal
Date: December 02, 2022Maleksalehi Mtn Opposition
Date: December 06, 202267725Reply001f76
Date: December 13, 202267772Notic00828a
Date: December 13, 202268132Propo01ae04
Date: December 20, 202268132Propo00d956
Date: December 20, 202268132Proof026e8a
Date: December 20, 202269176Abstr0025b2
Date: January 12, 202369426Notic00bb1a
Date: January 18, 2023Malek CMC 5.15.23
Date: April 28, 2023Decaration 5.5.23
Date: May 06, 2023Req_for_Dism_of_Turner_s_Cross_Complt
Date: May 19, 2023CIV110
Date: May 22, 202376312Ackno0086e5
Date: May 24, 2023Motion 6.30.23
Date: July 24, 2023POS
Date: July 24, 2023CMC Statement 10.25.23
Date: October 17, 2023Declaration Tanzeel Hak
Date: October 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2035 | Docket Event | Case Message | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Change of Address / Residence Notice Filed | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | MC040 | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Tanzeel Hak | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Cross Complainant, Cross Defendant Lindow, Robert |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Appellant, Cross Complainant, Cross Defendant, Plaintiff Tabatabai, Shahram |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC Statement 10.25.23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.