Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lopez, Briceida, Solis, Jose, filed a(n) (24) Unlimited Product Liability case represented by Davis, Matthew D, against Amerigas, Inc., A Corporation, Amerigas Propane, Inc, A Corporation, Amerigas Propane, L.P., A Business Entity, Bonifacio, Paul, Does One Through One-Hundred, Inclusive, (total of 6) See All represented by Chin, Maytak, Gillette, Keith R., Toliver, Shawn A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Nancy L. Fineman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy L. Fineman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateApril 06, 2018 |
Category(24) Unlimited Product Liability |
Time To Trial683 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time766 days |
Request For Dismissal
Date: May 11, 2020Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 13, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: October 22, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 16, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: September 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 09, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 31, 2019Supplemental
Date: January 21, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: March 26, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: July 02, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 31, 2019Plaintiff's Brief re:
Date: September 13, 2019Evidence
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration in Reply
Date: April 26, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 03, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: January 10, 2020Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: April 23, 2019Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: October 28, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 28, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 28, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 14, 2019Declaration in Reply
Date: April 26, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 09, 2020Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: March 19, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 28, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: April 22, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 26, 2019Declaration
Date: May 25, 2018Compendium of Evidence in Support of
Date: October 30, 2019Order
Date: October 22, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 20, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: August 24, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: May 17, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 14, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: July 02, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: June 24, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: March 26, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: June 05, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: April 22, 2019Order
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: April 22, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 22, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: October 24, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: September 20, 2018Declaration in Reply
Date: January 09, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 12, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: March 26, 2019Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: March 19, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: April 23, 2019Supplemental
Date: August 20, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues
Date: January 17, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: March 11, 2020Motion to Bifurcate
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: February 06, 2020Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues
Date: January 14, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 20, 2019Order
Date: November 13, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 30, 2019Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: October 30, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: October 30, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 30, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 30, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 28, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 28, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: October 28, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: October 07, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 13, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: September 13, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 20, 2019Answer
Date: August 12, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 26, 2019Second Amended Complaint
Date: July 16, 2019Motion to Amend
Date: July 10, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 02, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 26, 2019Amended Notice Of
Date: June 18, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 26, 2019Order
Date: June 10, 2019Motion for Order
Date: May 30, 2019Motion for Order
Date: May 30, 2019Motion
Date: May 28, 2019Order
Date: May 22, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: May 24, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 22, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: May 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 17, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 22, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: May 17, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 14, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 14, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: May 13, 2019Motion for Issue and Monetary Sanction
Date: May 03, 2019Motion to Compel Interrogatories (form and special)
Date: May 03, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 26, 2019Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Date: May 03, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 26, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 26, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 23, 2019Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: April 23, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: April 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: April 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 16, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: April 22, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: March 29, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 26, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 26, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 26, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: March 26, 2019Order Denying
Date: March 22, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 12, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 29, 2018Answer
Date: October 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 13, 2018Amended Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 20, 2018First Amended Complaint
Date: September 20, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 17, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: July 18, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: July 13, 2018Motion for Change of Venue
Date: July 02, 2018Amendment to Complaint
Date: June 28, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 25, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 19, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 19, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 25, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 25, 2018Motion
Date: May 25, 2018Complaint
Date: April 06, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: February 03, 2020Order
Date: January 29, 2020Order
Date: January 29, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: January 28, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: January 24, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: January 24, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 21, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 13, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: January 13, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: January 13, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 13, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: January 13, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: January 10, 2020Order
Date: January 10, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 09, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 09, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 07, 2020Non-Opposition to
Date: January 02, 2020Objections to Evidence
Date: December 31, 2019Motion to Bifurcate
Date: December 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 30, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 30, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Request For Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19 8.18.20 Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19 |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Quash 03/11/2020 Motion to Quash DEPOSITION SUBPOENA Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Added by automated script |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: MOTION TO QUASH This motion is MOOT. A notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case was filed February 6, 2020. |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Bifurcate 02/24/2020 MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL AND TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AMERIGAS DEFENDANTS' FINANCIAL CONDITIONS PENDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES DETERMINATION Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: MOTION TO BIFURCATE The motion is MOOT. Notice of conditional settlement of the entire case was filed February 6, 2020. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 15 DAYS
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.