Related Content
in DeKalb County
Ruling
WHITTAKER VS GRAY
Jul 21, 2024 |
FL-19-002701
FL-19-002701 – WHITTAKER VS GRAY
Petitioner’s Request for Order re Enforce Judgment, etc.—HEARING REQUIRED.
The Court finds that proof of service is on file and reflects valid and timely individual mail service of Respondent as required. (Fam. Code, § 215(a).) Respondent did not file a Responsive Declaration or written opposition. Consequently, the Court is inclined to grant the requested relief.
However, a final judgment is already an “order” that the parties are bound to comply with and a further order to comply by the Court would be redundant. That said, Petitioner’s claims all relate to that part of the judgment dealing with division of pension plans and this has not been accomplished due to Respondent’s non-cooperation.
Accordingly, the Court will not further delay proceedings by again ordering Respondent’s cooperation and, instead, finds good cause to appoint the clerk of the Court as elisor to sign the QDRO and other necessary papers on Respondent’s behalf. But Petitioner must first submit a proposed order with the exact documents to be signed attached to it for review and approval by the Court. (Local Rules, rule 7.08(A).) Petitioner is free to use all the means to obtain information provided by the Civil Discovery Act if documents or other information has not been provided by Respondent. (Fam. Code, § 218.) And the Court will reserve jurisdiction over the issue of monetary sanctions against Respondent for the necessity of Petitioner having to file post-judgment motions to obtain Respondent’s compliance.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: JESSICA DIX
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01525
Case Number:
24STCP01525
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
CATHERINE LANGSTON vs. JOHN LANGSTON
Jul 19, 2024 |
24FC08644
No appearances necessary. The petition for dissolution was filed on January 11, 2024 and a response was filed on February 22, 2024. Respondent is ordered to serve his Preliminary Financial Disclosures (FL-140) and file a Declaration Regarding Service (FL-141) before the next court appearance. Respondent is referred to the court’s Family Law Facilitator for assistance. The FLF is available via email at selfhelp@amadorcourt.org. Further case management is scheduled for November 15, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3. A Family Law CMC Statement must be filed and served at least 15 days prior to the CMC. (https://www.amadorcourt.org/localForms/familyLaw/FamilyLaw_CMC-STATEMENT.pdf)
Ruling
City of Anderson vs. Krumins, et al.
Jul 16, 2024 |
23CV-0203032
CITY OF ANDERSON VS. KRUMINS, ET AL.
Case Number: 23CV-0203032
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of the receivership and clean up of the property. On July
2, 2024, the Court granted the Receiver’s Ex Parte Application for Order to Respondents to Vacate the
Receivership Property. The Ninth Report of the Receiver was filed on July 10, 2024. An appearance by all
parties is necessary on today’s calendar to discuss the status of the receivership.
Ruling
JENNIFER LOPEZ vs. PAUL CASTRO
Mar 08, 2024 |
23FC08625
Parties, or counsel if represented, are ordered to appear personally or remotely for hearing. You must notify the court and all other parties that you intend to appear remotely using form RA-010. In addition to providing notice, a Zoom link must be requested no later than one (1) court day before the hearing and shall be submitted to the Court through the Court’s website at https://www.amadorcourt.org/gi-zoomRequestForm.aspx.
Ruling
In Re: Bassett
Jul 19, 2024 |
24CV-0204432
IN RE: BASSETT
Case Number: 24CV-0204432
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Brittany R. Basset seeks to change the name of
her minor son. No proof of publication has been submitted. The Court requires a Certificate of Publication from
the publishing newspaper before the Petition may be granted. Additionally, the father of the minor has objected
to the proposed name change. An appearance by Petitioner and the father are necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
In Re: Bassett
Jul 17, 2024 |
24CV-0204432
IN RE: BASSETT
Case Number: 24CV-0204432
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Brittany R. Basset seeks to change the name of
her minor son. No proof of publication has been submitted. The Court requires a Certificate of Publication from
the publishing newspaper before the Petition may be granted. Additionally, the father of the minor has objected
to the proposed name change. An appearance by Petitioner and the father are necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
2024CUPT025317 IN THE MATTER OF: XOCHITL LIZBETH CASTRO FELIX
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY OF VENTURA
Tentative Ruling
2024CUPT025317: IN THE MATTER OF: XOCHITL LIZBETH CASTRO FELIX
07/19/2024 in Department 21
OSC - Name Change
The morning calendar in courtroom 21 will normally begin between 8:30 and 8:45 a.m. Please
arrive at the courtroom no later than 8:30 a.m. The door will be opened before the calendar is
called.
The Court allows appearances by CourtCall but is not equipped for Zoom. If appearing by
CourtCall, call in no later than 8:15 a.m. If you intend to appear by CourtCall, you must make
arrangements with CourtCall by 4:00 p.m. the day before your scheduled hearing. Requests for
approval of a CourtCall appearance made on the morning of the hearing will not be granted. No
exceptions will be made.
With respect to the tentative ruling below, no notice of intent to appear is required. If you wish to
submit on the tentative ruling you can fax notice to Judge Riley's secretary, Ms. Sedillos at
805-289-8705, stating that you submit on the tentative. You may also email the Court at:
Courtroom21@ventura.courts.ca.gov with all counsel copied on the email. Do not call in lieu of
sending a fax or email. If you submit on the tentative without appearing and the opposing party
appears, the hearing will be conducted in your absence. If you are the moving party and do not
communicate to the Court that you submit on the tentative or you do not appear at the hearing,
the Court may deny your motion irrespective of the tentative.
Unless stated otherwise at the hearing, if a formal order is not signed at the hearing, the
prevailing party shall prepare a proposed order and comply with CRC 3.1312 subdivisions (a),
(b), (d) and (e). The signed order shall be served on all parties and a proof of service filed with
the court. A "notice of ruling" in lieu of this procedure is not authorized.
Tentative Ruling
The Court GRANTS the Petition for Change of Name.
The Court finds all statutory requirements have been met and proceeds to confirm the spelling of
the proposed name with Petitioner.
A proof of publication was filed on June 27, 2024
Once the Court grants the Petition and signs the Decree Changing Name, a certified copy will
need to be obtained from the Records Department, Room 218. A certified copy of the Decree
will be needed to change the name on legal documents, including birth certificates, social
security cards, and other government-issued identification such as passports or driver’s licenses.