We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Georgia Ex. Rel.,, Ex Rel., Vs Antwon O. Flakes, Sr.

Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago

State Of Georgia, State Of Georgia Ex. Rel.,, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Hassan, Sarah A, against Flakes, Antwon O., Sr., in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts Superior with Morris, Shondeana C presiding.

Case Details for State Of Georgia v. Flakes, Antwon O., Sr. , et al.

Judge

Morris, Shondeana C

Filing Date

February 01, 2024

Category

Recovery Of Child Support (Uifsa)

Last Refreshed

May 18, 2024

Practice Area

Family

Filing Location

Dekalb County, GA

Matter Type

Child Support

Filing Court House

Superior

Parties for State Of Georgia v. Flakes, Antwon O., Sr. , et al.

Plaintiffs

State Of Georgia

State Of Georgia Ex. Rel.,

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Hassan, Sarah A

Defendants

Flakes, Antwon O., Sr.

Other Parties

Gray, Twinette Monique (Petitioner (participant))

Hassan, Sarah A (Attorney)

Case Documents for State Of Georgia v. Flakes, Antwon O., Sr. , et al.

GTO-Antwon Flakes Sr

Date: April 18, 2024

NOH-Antwon Flakes Sr

Date: March 13, 2024

Antwon Flakes Sr-440030808

Date: March 12, 2024

440030808-FLAKES- NTP

Date: February 01, 2024

440030808- FLAKES- UIFSA

Date: February 01, 2024

440030808- FLAKES- REQ OF ADMIS

Date: February 01, 2024

440030808- FLAKES- PATER

Date: February 01, 2024

440030808- FLAKES- INCAR

Date: February 01, 2024

440030808- FLAKES- DCSS

Date: February 01, 2024

440030808- FLAKES- SUMMONS

Date: February 01, 2024

440030808- FLAKES- CASE INIT

Date: February 01, 2024

Case Events for State Of Georgia v. Flakes, Antwon O., Sr. , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Order for Genetic Testing
Docket Event GTO-Antwon Flakes Sr
Docket Event Notice of Hearing
Docket Event NOH-Antwon Flakes Sr
Docket Event Affidavit of Service
Docket Event Antwon Flakes Sr-440030808
Docket Event Notice to Produce
Docket Event Uniform Support Petition
Docket Event Change Code
Standing Order

Judge: Dear Jackson, LaTisha

Docket Event Standing Order Governing Incarceration
See all events