Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodgers Forest Creek Llc Successor In Interest To Fl Forest Creek Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Matthew E Siegel, against Williams, Khorine, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a residential eviction case filed by Rodgers Forest Creek LLC against Khorine Williams in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant failed to pay rent in the amount of $901.41, which was due on or before Dec...
LEASE Doc # 4
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 6 ISSUED Party: WILLIAMS, KHORINE
Date: December 31, 2019THREE DAY NOTICE Doc # 5
Date: December 31, 2019COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT Doc # 3
Date: December 31, 2019CERTIFICATE Doc # 2 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 31, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: December 31, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 7 Party: WILLIAMS, KHORINE
Date: January 07, 2020DEF-RESP'S MOTION Doc # 9 TO DETERMINE RENT
Date: January 14, 2020ANSWER Doc # 8 Party: WILLIAMS, KHORINE
Date: January 14, 2020ORDER Doc # 10 DIRECTING DEFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY BY 012720
Date: January 15, 2020DEF-RESP'S MOTION Doc # 11 FOR EXTENSION/ AND REQUEST FOR HEARING
Date: January 27, 2020ORDER DENYING Doc # 12 DEFTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 30, 2020MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 13 AND NOTICE OF DEFTS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER
Date: January 31, 2020ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT Doc # 15 OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2020STIPULATION Doc # 17 AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT
Date: February 27, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 21 TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT
Date: August 19, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 22
Date: September 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 22
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 21 TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Doc # 20
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING (R) Doc # 19 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT / DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE / CLERK TO DISBURSE COURT REGISTRY FUNDS Vol./Book 20908, Page 26, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 17 AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 16 FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSING COURT REGISTRY FUNDS AND VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT. IF APPLICABLE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT Doc # 15 OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.