Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Snell, Thomas Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WILSON, TANYA DAVIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILSON, TANYA DAVIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 29, 215 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: February 23, 2022ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: December 22, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2022001832
Date: January 07, 2022INFORMATION
Date: December 22, 2021WARRANT ARREST-BOOKING REPORT FILED WANTED PERSONS TABLE ADVICE TO DEFENDANT
Date: July 21, 2021FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.
Date: July 21, 2021WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: July 21, 2021NOTIFICATION OF NONFILING OF INFORMATION ON OR BEFORE 33RD DAY
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: March 06, 2022NOTICE OF PRIOR CONVICTION & CRIMINAL HISTORY
Date: March 06, 2022NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST
Date: March 06, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Date: July 15, 2021WAIVER OF PRESENCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: February 15, 20226/26/2023
Date: April 06, 20246/26/2023
Date: April 03, 20246/16/2023
Date: April 03, 20246/26/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/12/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/2/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/28/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/27/2023
Date: April 02, 20244/27/2023
Date: April 04, 20244/21/2023
Date: April 04, 20244/24/2023
Date: April 02, 20244/17/2023
Date: April 12, 20244/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/20/2023
Date: April 09, 20244/17/2023
Date: April 15, 20244/19/2023
Date: April 29, 2153/15/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/9/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/8/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/7/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/3/2023
Date: April 02, 20242/2/2023
Date: April 02, 20242/3/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/2/2023
Date: April 03, 20242/2/2023
Date: April 04, 20241/25/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/2/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/2/2023
Date: April 05, 20242/1/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/19/2023
Date: April 07, 20241/11/2023
Date: April 07, 20241/11/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/5/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/4/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/5/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/3/2023
Date: April 01, 202411/30/2022
Date: April 01, 202411/1/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/22/2022
Date: April 01, 202410/24/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/21/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/20/2022
Date: April 02, 20249/22/2022
Date: April 02, 20249/20/2022
Date: April 01, 20247/20/2022
Date: April 01, 20247/12/2022
Date: April 02, 20247/7/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/30/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/10/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/29/2022
Date: April 02, 20245/4/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/6/2022
Date: April 01, 20242/23/2022
Date: April 02, 20242/23/2022
Date: April 01, 20242/15/2022
Date: April 01, 20242/4/2022
Date: April 04, 20241/7/2022
Date: April 02, 20241/6/2022
Date: April 02, 202412/22/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/3/2022
Date: April 03, 20248/23/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/22/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/21/2021
Date: April 06, 20247/21/2021
Date: April 02, 20247/21/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/15/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/13/2021
Date: April 10, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.