Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Llerena, Ashel Alexander, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Granny'S Garden Ii Inc, Rodriguez Chavez, Adrian, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeARENDAS, CHRISTINE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 115 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Asbel Alexander Llerena against Adrian Rodriguez Chavez and Granny's Garden II, Inc. The complaint alleges that on December 3, 2019, Llerena was driving a motor vehicle on Neptune Road in Kissimmee, Florida...
REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 06, 2022UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER
Date: June 19, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 13, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 07, 2023DEFENDANTS' EXPERT AND BOECHER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: April 06, 2023DEFENDANT FACT WITNESS LIST
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: November 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS
Date: January 09, 2024NOTICE OF SERVING JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 11, 2023DEFENDANT GRANNY GARDEN II INC SOCIAL MEDIA INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF ASBEL ALEXANDER LLERENA
Date: September 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON- OBJECTION
Date: April 06, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO EXPERT AND BOECHER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 21, 2023COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL JURY
Date: November 18, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 05, 2024PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GRANNYS GARDEN II INC
Date: November 18, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE MEDICAL BILL SUMMARY
Date: January 05, 2024TRIAL PERIOD MARCH 11, 2024 - MARCH 28, 2024
Date: February 01, 2024PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GRANNYS GARDEN II INC
Date: November 18, 2020DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SURVEILLANCE INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 05, 2024PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 08, 2023DEFENDANTS’ ANNOTATED LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS FORTHE COURT’S MARKING
Date: January 19, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNTION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ASBEL ALEXANDER LLERENA
Date: March 06, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLAINCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: November 18, 2020DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: April 29, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 28, 2021DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: January 22, 2024NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 23, 2023DEFENDANTS’ AMENDED ANNOTATED LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS FORTHE COURT’S MARKING
Date: February 28, 2024DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 14, 2024NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD
Date: December 09, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF ASBEL ALEXANDER LLERENA
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 01, 2024PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NON PARTY PRODUCTION SUBPOENAS
Date: June 07, 2023NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF DR. DONALD BEHRMANN
Date: February 28, 2024DEFENDANTS' THIRD NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: March 20, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 27, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS' SERVING BOECHER INTERROGATROIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: August 16, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JULIANNE FRAIN, PH.D
Date: August 25, 2023NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: December 22, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: December 21, 2023MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF THE PLAINTIFF
Date: November 01, 2023PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LISTS AND EVIDENCE SCHEDULE
Date: December 11, 2023DEFENDANTS’ THIRDAMENDED ANNOTATED LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS FORTHE COURT’S MARKING
Date: March 10, 2024PLAINTIFF’S PROPOSED PRETRIALSTATEMENT
Date: January 19, 2024COVER LETTER RE: ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 06, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 16, 2021DEFENDANS' NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 15, 2020DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO ADCANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP
Date: March 15, 2023DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO ELITE IMAGING
Date: March 15, 2023PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 15, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 23, 2023NOTICE FOR TRIAL
Date: June 17, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 06, 2021PLAINTIFF’SMOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING HOLLENBECK VS. HOOKS
Date: January 15, 2024DEFENDANT'S ADRIAN RODRIGUEZ CHAVEZ'Z SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 05, 2023DEFENDANTS' FOURTH NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING CONTINUED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: February 05, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 30, 2023DEFENDANTS' FIFTH NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING UPDATED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ASBEL ALEXANDER LLERENA
Date: November 20, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: November 19, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: December 18, 2023SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ASBEL ALEXANDER LLERENA
Date: February 28, 2024PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFENDANT ADRIAN RODRIGUEZ CHAVEZ
Date: November 18, 2020PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: May 25, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: October 26, 2021DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 14, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 26, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 27, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SECOND SET OF BOECHER INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 10, 2024DEFENDANTS' SECOND EXPERT AND BOECHER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 10, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 18, 2020DEFENDANTS' EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: November 07, 2023PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF DROPPING WAGE LOSS CLAIM AND FUTURE EARNING CAPACITY
Date: March 06, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE MEDICAL BILL SUMMARY
Date: March 05, 2024PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 09, 2024DEFENDANTS’ OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: February 19, 2024DEFENDANT, ADRIAN RODRIGUEZ CHAVEZ'S UPDATED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 09, 2023NOTICE OF FILING HEARING TRANSCRIPT
Date: March 09, 2024NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: March 04, 2022DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: April 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL
Date: March 11, 2024PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO BOECHER INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL
Date: March 08, 2024PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ADRIAN RODRIGUEZ CHAVEZ
Date: November 18, 2020PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 15, 2021DEFENDANTS’NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MING XIAO, PH.D., AS EXPERT
Date: February 27, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 13, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DR. DONALD BEHRMANN
Date: August 25, 2023DEFENDANT, GRANNY'S GARDEN II, INC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 22, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED VERDICT FORM
Date: December 21, 2023PRETRIAL TRIAL CHECKLIST AND ORDER CONTROLLING TRIAL
Date: January 19, 2024PLAINTIFF’SRESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 15, 2024ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 21, 2024DEFENDANTS’ OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF’S NOTICES OF HEARING FILED FEBRUARY 27, 2024
Date: February 28, 2024MISDEMEANOR CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 10, 2024JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 10, 2024PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 10, 2024DEFENDANT SECOND NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES
Date: June 22, 2022MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT: NO AGREEMENT
Date: January 27, 2022PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020091373
Date: November 20, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF
Date: March 20, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF
Date: March 03, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: November 18, 2020PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ADRIAN RODRIGUEZ CHEAVEZ
Date: November 18, 2020PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT GRANNYS GARDEN II INC
Date: November 18, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 02, 202111/18/2020
Date: April 04, 20243/22/2023
Date: April 03, 20246/9/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/19/2024
Date: April 27, 20652/15/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/25/2021
Date: April 01, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/23/2023
Date: April 06, 20247/21/2023
Date: April 07, 20246/30/2023
Date: April 04, 202410/30/2023
Date: April 06, 202412/22/2023
Date: April 27, 20721/15/2024
Date: April 01, 202410/6/2021
Date: April 02, 20242/8/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/6/2024
Date: April 01, 20243/15/2023
Date: April 10, 20242/28/2024
Date: April 27, 205110/30/2023
Date: April 08, 20242/15/2021
Date: April 02, 20242/5/2024
Date: April 05, 20243/4/2022
Date: April 02, 202410/24/2023
Date: April 06, 202411/20/2023
Date: April 05, 20243/1/2024
Date: April 03, 202411/18/2020
Date: April 02, 20242/14/2024
Date: April 02, 202412/15/2020
Date: April 12, 20242/19/2024
Date: April 10, 202411/18/2020
Date: April 01, 20243/5/2024
Date: April 03, 20242/19/2024
Date: April 06, 20247/20/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/13/2023
Date: April 09, 20246/30/2023
Date: April 15, 20247/27/2023
Date: April 06, 20243/13/2023
Date: April 05, 202412/11/2023
Date: April 07, 202411/18/2020
Date: April 03, 20241/5/2024
Date: April 02, 20246/30/2023
Date: April 05, 20241/3/2024
Date: April 02, 20244/6/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/28/2021
Date: April 02, 202412/15/2023
Date: April 05, 20247/21/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/19/2024
Date: April 27, 20711/19/2024
Date: April 05, 20242/28/2024
Date: April 27, 1151/15/2024
Date: April 02, 20243/5/2024
Date: April 05, 20242/14/2024
Date: April 05, 20242/27/2024
Date: April 02, 202411/19/2020
Date: April 08, 20246/17/2022
Date: April 01, 202412/15/2020
Date: April 08, 20241/9/2023
Date: April 03, 20248/25/2023
Date: April 06, 20249/22/2023
Date: April 08, 20245/16/2022
Date: April 02, 20246/19/2023
Date: April 09, 20242/25/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/9/2024
Date: April 07, 202412/9/2020
Date: April 01, 202410/28/2022
Date: April 02, 202410/26/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/13/2023
Date: April 03, 20242/28/2024
Date: April 05, 20246/7/2023
Date: April 02, 20242/16/2021
Date: April 02, 20242/8/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/10/2024
Date: April 05, 20242/1/2024
Date: April 01, 20249/22/2023
Date: April 05, 20241/9/2024
Date: April 03, 20242/2/2024
Date: April 03, 202411/18/2020
Date: April 06, 20242/28/2024
Date: April 27, 206712/8/2023
Date: April 06, 202411/7/2023
Date: April 26, 20241/15/2024
Date: April 07, 20243/6/2024
Date: April 27, 20696/26/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/21/2020
Date: April 07, 20243/3/2024
Date: April 02, 20247/31/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 03, 20241/19/2024
Date: April 20, 20242/27/2024
Date: April 27, 20392/8/2024
Date: April 04, 202412/21/2023
Date: April 03, 20242/6/2024
Date: April 02, 20243/15/2023
Date: April 09, 202412/8/2023
Date: April 09, 20243/6/2024
Date: April 02, 20246/21/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/26/2023
Date: April 05, 20241/22/2024
Date: April 05, 20242/28/2024
Date: April 01, 20241/19/2024
Date: April 07, 20241/5/2024
Date: April 04, 202412/21/2023
Date: April 27, 20482/27/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/5/2023
Date: April 02, 20244/5/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/2/2021
Date: April 02, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ADRIAN RODRIGUEZ CHAVEZ
Date: March 10, 2024PROPOSED VERDICT FORM
Date: January 19, 2024PLAINTIFF DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: October 24, 2023VERDICT FORM
Date: March 10, 2024NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF TIMOTHY BUNDY, D.O., CLCP, ATC
Date: March 10, 2024DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 21, 2023DEFENDANT SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 07, 2024DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CONFLICT WITH TRIAL
Date: February 08, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SECOND SET OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DR DONALD BEHRMANN
Date: July 31, 2023DEFENDANT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 08, 2023DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANTS’PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: January 19, 2024DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO AKIUMIN
Date: March 15, 2023COVER LETTER RE: ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 28, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF EXPERT, MING XIAO, P.H.D., P.E., ACTAR
Date: February 14, 2024NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONOF HEARING
Date: March 06, 2024AMENDED VERDICT FORM
Date: March 10, 2024DEFENDANT NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 16, 2022PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE AS TO ADMISSION OF LIABILITY
Date: January 15, 2024DEFENDANTS’MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING REPTILE THEORY AND ARGUMENT
Date: January 19, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGANTION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING UPDATEDANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING PORPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: September 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION
Date: April 24, 2023NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF SILMARIE ACEVEDO
Date: February 28, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING CONTINUED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF TIMONTHY BUNDY, P.O., CLCP, ATC
Date: February 14, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS
Date: January 03, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF EXPERT, DR. MARC D. KAYE
Date: February 14, 2024PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSE
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF TIMOTHY BUNDY, D.O., CLCP, ATC
Date: February 28, 2024PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: December 09, 2020PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSESTO ADD REBUTTAL EXPERT
Date: December 11, 20232/14/2024
Date: April 03, 20242/14/2024
Date: April 04, 202412/15/2020
Date: April 02, 20242/19/2024
Date: April 12, 20246/5/2023
Date: April 03, 20241/10/2024
Date: April 06, 20248/16/2021
Date: April 02, 20244/24/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/13/2023
Date: April 06, 20241/9/2023
Date: April 06, 202412/21/2023
Date: April 06, 20243/3/2023
Date: April 03, 20248/10/2023
Date: April 02, 20244/29/2021
Date: April 04, 20243/6/2024
Date: April 01, 202410/30/2023
Date: April 05, 202412/18/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/10/2024
Date: April 08, 20249/22/2023
Date: April 02, 20244/13/2023
Date: April 02, 202411/20/2020
Date: April 01, 202411/20/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/12/2024
Date: April 02, 20241/19/2024
Date: April 26, 20241/15/2024
Date: April 04, 20243/1/2024
Date: April 05, 20242/28/2024
Date: April 08, 20242/28/2024
Date: April 27, 20701/26/2024
Date: April 03, 20241/15/2024
Date: April 06, 202412/15/2023
Date: April 09, 202412/21/2020
Date: April 03, 202411/1/2023
Date: April 03, 202410/11/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/19/2024
Date: April 03, 20247/6/2022
Date: April 05, 20241/27/2022
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2072 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2071 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2070 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2069 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2067 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2065 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2051 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2048 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2039 | Docket Event | ||
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.