Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Robertson Trustee, Karen J, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Ryan Ii, Robert P, Ryan, Mark R, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with LAW, WILLIAM G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Karen J. Robertson, Trustee of the Rosemary A. Ryan Revocable Trust, and Diana M. Davenport against Mark R. Ryan and Robert P. Ryan, II. The complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 19th Judicial Circuit in Lake Count...
RESPONSE
Date: September 01, 2016OBJECTION
Date: November 21, 2013ANSWER OF
Date: September 11, 2013EXHIBIT
Date: May 24, 2013MOTION
Date: January 21, 2015LETTER
Date: November 18, 2014MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 12, 2014OBJECTION
Date: August 05, 2014REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 01, 2014NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: January 17, 2014EXHIBIT
Date: May 24, 2013ORDER
Date: December 19, 2013EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: December 11, 2013RESPONSE
Date: December 02, 2013ORDER
Date: December 02, 2013EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: October 16, 2013MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 11, 2013MOTION
Date: June 26, 2013ORDER
Date: August 30, 2013EXHIBIT
Date: May 24, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2012EXHIBIT
Date: May 24, 2013MOTION
Date: May 24, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE PRO SE RESPONSE BY DEFT DIANA DAVENPORT |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED JAN 04, 2016 / FILING PROPOSED ORDER |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, AND PENDING MATTERS AND ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PROPOSED DISTRIBUTION |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
TEXT ROSEMARY A. RYAN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST ADDITIONAL DISBURSEMENTS AND FINAL TRUST DISTRIBUTIONS |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
TEXT AMENDED FINAL ACCOUNTING OF THE ROSEMARY A. RYAN REVOCABLE TRUST |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PROPOSED DISTRIBUTION |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
TEXT ACCOUNTING OF THE ROSEMARY A. RYAN REVOCABLE TRUST FROM 1/1/15 - 9/2/15 |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE DEFTS EVIDENCE FROM HEARING ON JULY 08, 2015 WITH JUDGE WILLIAM G LAW / EVIDENCE INVENTORY / STORED IN THE VAULT |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 07/08/15 AT 10:00 AM AS TO VARIOUS MOTIONS | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEFTS MOTION AND SUPPORT FOR CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.