Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Venissa Driggers As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of David Flick Deceased, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Holden, Howard William, Spivey, Randall L, against Atlanta Restaurant Partners Llc, Barcia, Mark, Bwr North Port Llc, Hooters Of Port Charlotte Inc, Jackmont Hospitality Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Adams, Laurie J, Kirollos, Yasmine, Truitt, Curtright C, Unice, Thomas R Jr, Brankamp, Joshua W, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 118 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a wrongful death action filed by Venissa Driggers, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David B. Flick, against multiple defendants. The complaint alleges that the defendants, including Mark Barcia, Hooters of Port Charlo...
COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIA
Date: April 09, 2021STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: April 09, 2021SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - 04/12/21 - MARK BARCIA
Date: April 09, 2021PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2021022238
Date: April 12, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC.
Date: April 09, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 30, 2021DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIA'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 16, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 05/18/2021 - MARK BARCIA, ET AL
Date: June 09, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION - DEFENDANT
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: June 23, 2021DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: May 14, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION - HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/25/2021 @ 09:30 AM
Date: May 27, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION - MARK BARCIA
Date: June 07, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: November 15, 2021DEFENDANT, BWR NORTH PORT LLC DBA BUFFALO WINGS AND RINGS PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: November 03, 2021JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: October 26, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIA'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 03, 2021ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICING DEFENDANTS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 03, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE , INC. REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 06, 2021PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: October 28, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATORS/MOTION TO APPOINT NON-BINDING ARBITRATOR
Date: October 26, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: September 23, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/15/2021 @ 01:30 PM
Date: September 15, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 23, 2021ORDER REFERRING CASE TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION
Date: September 23, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 19, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/15/2021 @ 10:30 AM
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 19, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 13, 2021OBJECTION - OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 13, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/06/2022 @ 11:00 AM
Date: March 22, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/02/2022 @ 01:30 PM
Date: March 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 05/16/2022 @ 10:30 AM
Date: March 09, 2022DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA'S MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 10, 2022MOTION - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 04/21/2022 @ 08:30 AM
Date: March 04, 2022DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIAS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UPON PLAINTIFF
Date: February 25, 2022PLAINTIFF'S CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO TELECONF
Date: February 15, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 04/22/2022 @ 08:30 AM
Date: March 04, 2022RE-NOTICE - RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (CANCELS 2/8/22 - MICHELLE MOULTON - 03/01/2022
Date: February 01, 2022RE-NOTICE - RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (CANCELS 2/8/22 - MARY MOULTON - 03/01/2022
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFF''S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: January 28, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES - PLAINTIFF''S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 28, 2022RE-NOTICE - RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (CANCELS 2/8/22 - MICHAEL LAUFF - 03/01/2022
Date: February 01, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 28, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING CONFIRMATION NUMBER 269914 - JUNE 2, 2022
Date: March 30, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - MICHELLE MOULTON - SERVED - 12/09/2021
Date: December 10, 2021AMENDED AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: January 20, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: December 03, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 07, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - RECORDS CUSTODIAN OF KIEWIT CORPORATION - SERVED - 01/20/2022
Date: January 24, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - MARY MOULTON - SERVED - 12/11/2021
Date: December 13, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 24, 2022DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 18, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE - MICHAEL LAUFF - SERVED - 12/11/2021
Date: December 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: January 18, 2022CONFIDENTIALITY PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 16, 2021ORDER
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - MICHAEL LAUFF - 02/08/2022 @ 10:00 AM
Date: November 17, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION 12/17/21
Date: December 30, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 15, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 10, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 07, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - MICHELLE MOULTON - 02/08/2022 @ 03:00 PM
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - MARY MOULTON - 02/08/2022 @ 12:30 PM
Date: November 17, 2021DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC.'S WITNESS LIST
Date: November 22, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: January 05, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING- THURSDAY, JUNE 2, 2022 @ 1:30 P.M.
Date: April 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 04/21/2022 @ 08:30 AM
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 06/06/2022 @ 11:00 AM
Date: May 11, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: April 22, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: April 21, 2022DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 02, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT’S VERIFIED AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 17, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MARK BARCIAS REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 06, 2022DEFENDANT, BWR NORTH PORT, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO WINGS AND RINGS PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: May 17, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: May 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: December 15, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 6/6/2022 @ 11:00 AM VIA ZOOM
Date: March 22, 2022ORDER VACATING ORDER SETIN GJURY TRIAL/ NON- JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: September 19, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 01/13/2023 @ 09:00 AM
Date: September 09, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - HEIDI CARSTENS - 12/07/2022 @ 01:00 PM
Date: September 09, 2022AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 12, 2022WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC.'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: September 08, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: September 02, 2022ORDER EXTENDING NON-BINDING ARBITRATION DISCOVERY DEADLINE
Date: September 01, 2022JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND NON-BINDING ARBITRATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES
Date: September 01, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES - AMENDED REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 19, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES - REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PAUL HUBAI - 12/19/2022 @ 02:30 PM
Date: August 16, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES - REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DARRELL BOURLIER - 12/08/2022 @ 09:00 AM
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - BRIAN BOURLIER - 12/07/2022 @ 02:00 PM
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PIERRE RICHARD LOUIS - 12/01/2022 @ 03:00 PM
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - HEATHER BOURLIER - 12/07/2022 @ 09:00 AM
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE - NOTICE OF JOINDER
Date: August 12, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: August 12, 2022WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: August 12, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION - HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT LIST - DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT LIST - DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIA'S, EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 10, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT LIST - VENISSA DRIGGERS
Date: July 27, 2022WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIA'S, FACT WITNESS LIST
Date: July 27, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION LINDSEY HUNT 10/13/2022 @1PM
Date: July 19, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - VERONICA SANTIAGO - 10/12/2022 @ 09:00 AM
Date: July 15, 2022PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO TELECONFERENCE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION
Date: July 22, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO TELECONFERENCE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION
Date: July 22, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - TIMOTHY BURGESS - 10/17/2022 @ 04:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - THOMAS HUGHES - 10/17/2022 @ 02:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - SAMANTHA MONNIER - 10/13/2022 @ 02:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - LEANELIS GARCIA - 10/12/2022 @ 04:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - LINDSEY HUNT - 10/11/2022 @ 01:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - BRITTANY LIVINGSTON - 10/13/2022 @ 04:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - BECCA ANASTASI - 10/13/2022 @ 03:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - KATIE HINDS - 10/17/2022 @ 01:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - BYRON HOLLEY - 10/12/2022 @ 01:00 PM
Date: July 15, 2022PLAINTIFFS AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/19/2022 @ 11:00 AM
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 09/21/2022 @ 09:00 AM
Date: July 15, 2022DEFENDANTS MARK BARCIAS STATEMENT OF FACTS DISPUTED FACTS AND ISSUES OF LAW
Date: July 11, 2022NOTICE OF FILING - VERIFICATION PAGE
Date: June 23, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: June 07, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: June 02, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PIERRE RICHARD LOUIS - 12/01/2022 @ 03:00 PM
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION CONDUCT HYBRID MEDIATION/NON- BINDING ARBITRATION VIA REMOTE MEANS
Date: November 29, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - TIMOTHY BURGESS - 11/21/2022 @ 04:00 PM
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JENNIFER JEAN - 01/26/2023 @ 09:00 AM
Date: November 23, 2022PLAINTIFF’S SECONDED AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTELECONFERENCE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT LIST - DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 17, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - PIERRE RICHARD LOUIS - SERVED - 10/17/2022
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 10/17/2022 @ 04:00 PM
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 10/17/2022 @ 02:00 PM
Date: October 17, 2022WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: November 17, 2022WITNESS LIST - PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE - 02/02/2023 @ 01:00 PM
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE - 01/18/2023 @ 01:00 PM
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION LEANELIS GARCIA
Date: November 10, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - HEIDI CARSTENS - 12/07/2022 @ 01:00 PM
Date: December 06, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PIERRE RICHARD LOUIS - 12/01/2022 @ 03:00 PM
Date: November 30, 2022AGREED ORDER TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LEANELIS GARCIA
Date: November 09, 2022AGREED ORDER TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LEANELIS GARCIA
Date: November 08, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LEANELIS GARCIA
Date: October 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS UNDER RULE 1.351
Date: October 03, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 01/13/2023 @ 10:00 AM
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 07, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC’S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 22, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - NICOLE F. CIMMINO - 01/19/2023 @ 02:30 PM
Date: September 20, 2022PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON OCTOBER 13, 2022 @3PM
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA’S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 22, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AARON NICK - 12/19/2022 @ 09:30 AM
Date: September 23, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 22, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - TAYLOR RENEE GREEN - 01/26/2023 @ 10:30 AM
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - SAVANNAH DANIELLE DAWSON - 01/25/2023 @ 01:00 PM
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PATRICIA A. SNIDER - 01/19/2023 @ 01:00 PM
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DARRELL BOULIER - 12/08/2022 @ 09:00 AM
Date: September 23, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JENNIFER JEAN ROBERSON - 01/26/2023 @ 09:00 AM
Date: October 03, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES - REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 23, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES - DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 21, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - MICHELLE MARJORINO - 01/19/2023 @ 10:30 AM
Date: September 20, 2022DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIA'S MOTION TO EXCUSE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION/NON-BINDING ARBITRATION
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JOSEPH S. MARJORINO - 01/19/2023 @ 09:00 AM
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - BRADLEY A. JARVIS - 01/25/2023 @ 02:30 PM
Date: September 20, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: April 04, 2023DISCLOSURE - DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL/NON JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: March 21, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING CONFIRMATION NUMBER 278676 - 4/4/2023 @ 1:30 PM
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: March 29, 2023HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC.’S MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2023DEFENDANT MARK BARCIA'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO UNSEAL ARBITRATION AWARD AS TO DEFENDANTS
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/30/2023 @ 09:30 AM
Date: April 25, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: April 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 04/14/2023 @ 09:30 AM
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 07, 20239/12/2022
Date: May 04, 20249/22/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/4/2023
Date: May 08, 20243/1/2023
Date: May 30, 20246/23/2023
Date: May 03, 1186/27/2023
Date: May 09, 202412/22/2022
Date: May 10, 20246/27/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/26/2023
Date: May 05, 20246/28/2023
Date: May 07, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 03, 20682/14/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/23/2022
Date: May 07, 20243/2/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/4/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/11/2022
Date: May 04, 20244/14/2023
Date: May 07, 20243/30/2023
Date: May 09, 20245/31/2022
Date: May 16, 20247/29/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/25/2022
Date: May 02, 20246/30/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/30/2023
Date: May 04, 20248/19/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/27/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/29/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/4/2023
Date: May 03, 20243/21/2022
Date: May 06, 20244/5/2023
Date: May 03, 20242/3/2023
Date: May 02, 20247/12/2022
Date: May 11, 20241/23/2023
Date: May 06, 202411/15/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/30/2023
Date: May 03, 20244/6/2023
Date: May 06, 20243/2/2023
Date: May 04, 202410/7/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/14/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/16/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/7/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/1/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/21/2023
Date: May 07, 20245/6/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/14/2023
Date: May 03, 20245/14/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/1/2022
Date: May 04, 202410/26/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/23/2022
Date: May 05, 20247/23/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/17/2021
Date: May 10, 20241/20/2022
Date: May 04, 20244/19/2022
Date: May 05, 202411/17/2022
Date: May 07, 202412/12/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/9/2021
Date: May 02, 202412/10/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/12/2023
Date: May 03, 20241/24/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/24/2022
Date: May 05, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 06, 202411/19/2021
Date: May 04, 20247/13/2021
Date: May 10, 202410/6/2021
Date: May 05, 20241/27/2023
Date: May 06, 20245/24/2021
Date: May 09, 20244/22/2022
Date: May 03, 20244/10/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/7/2021
Date: May 13, 20249/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20246/23/2021
Date: May 13, 202410/6/2021
Date: May 03, 20417/15/2021
Date: May 13, 202411/8/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/15/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/29/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/24/2021
Date: May 03, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 01, 202412/6/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/7/2023
Date: May 19, 20242/28/2023
Date: May 08, 20242/25/2022
Date: May 03, 20243/30/2023
Date: May 28, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 30, 202410/26/2022
Date: May 07, 20244/7/2023
Date: May 04, 202412/14/2022
Date: May 04, 202411/17/2022
Date: May 20, 20246/21/2023
Date: May 03, 19753/22/2022
Date: May 04, 20241/16/2023
Date: May 08, 20246/27/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/22/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/28/2022
Date: May 02, 202412/20/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/18/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/15/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/5/2023
Date: May 02, 202410/8/2021
Date: May 03, 20325/17/2022
Date: May 03, 20247/14/2022
Date: May 07, 20243/2/2023
Date: May 01, 20241/18/2022
Date: May 04, 202411/9/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/2/2022
Date: May 03, 20247/22/2022
Date: May 02, 20243/1/2023
Date: May 08, 20246/27/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/11/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/22/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/19/2022
Date: May 19, 20245/2/2022
Date: May 03, 20247/19/2021
Date: May 15, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 04, 20249/7/2021
Date: May 03, 202411/3/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/12/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/23/2021
Date: May 04, 20246/22/2021
Date: May 08, 20245/16/2022
Date: May 01, 20247/21/2021
Date: May 04, 202410/6/2021
Date: May 04, 20245/27/2021
Date: May 03, 20244/30/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/20/2022
Date: May 03, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 18, 20244/4/2023
Date: May 03, 203910/14/2022
Date: May 07, 20244/13/2023
Date: May 07, 202411/28/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/28/2023
Date: May 05, 20243/29/2023
Date: May 08, 20245/19/2023
Date: May 03, 20244/12/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/23/2023
Date: May 04, 20246/21/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 03, 205812/19/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/19/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/28/2023
Date: May 25, 20243/21/2023
Date: May 05, 202410/10/2022
Date: May 11, 20242/10/2023
Date: May 20, 202411/30/2022
Date: May 04, 202410/14/2022
Date: May 06, 202412/23/2022
Date: May 04, 20248/3/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/11/2022
Date: May 04, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 31, 20249/1/2022
Date: May 04, 20246/27/2023
Date: May 05, 20245/25/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/27/2021
Date: May 10, 20241/10/2023
Date: May 02, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 04, 20247/16/2021
Date: May 17, 20244/6/2023
Date: May 03, 20244/28/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/6/2023
Date: May 03, 20469/19/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/18/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/5/2022
Date: May 04, 20243/16/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/4/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/14/2022
Date: May 03, 202411/3/2021
Date: May 03, 202412/7/2021
Date: May 03, 202410/3/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/6/2023
Date: May 03, 20246/9/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/21/2021
Date: May 15, 20245/19/2021
Date: May 10, 20241/17/2023
Date: May 04, 202412/30/2021
Date: May 06, 20241/24/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/13/2021
Date: May 06, 20248/10/2022
Date: May 09, 20247/19/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/7/2021
Date: May 03, 20249/20/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/10/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/7/2021
Date: May 30, 2024NOTICE OF FILING - DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - TIMOTHY BURGESS - 03/08/2023 @ 01:00 PM
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS
Date: March 02, 2023MOTION - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 28, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 03/13/2023 @ 01:30 PM
Date: March 02, 2023PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 04/25/2023 @ 08:30 AM
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PIERRE RICHARD LOUIS - 03/02/2023 @ 02:00 PM
Date: March 01, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION - HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE, INC
Date: February 28, 2023MOTION - DEFENDNAT HOOTERS OF PORT CHARLOTTE INC'S MOTIO FOR TRIAL E NOVO
Date: February 28, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 04/25/2023 @ 08:30 AM
Date: February 08, 2023ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: January 25, 2023JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 25, 2023SECOND AMENDED AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: February 22, 2023MOTION - DEFENDANT, MARK BARCIA'S, MOTION FOR TRIAL DE NOVO
Date: February 22, 2023PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DECES TECUM
Date: February 21, 2023PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTELECONFERENCE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ARBITRATOR'S SEALED NON-BINDIG ARBITRATION FINDINGS AND AWARD
Date: February 03, 2023REPORT OF MEDIATOR
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 03/03/2023 @ 09:30 AM
Date: March 01, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - BRADLEY A. JARVIS - 01/19/2023 @ 01:00 PM
Date: January 18, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( PLEASE CONTACT THE UNDESIGNED IF AN INTERPRETER IS NEEDED )
Date: January 26, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTIICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM 2-2-2023 @ 1:00 PM
Date: January 26, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PATRICIA A. SNIDER - 01/25/2023 @ 02:30 PM
Date: January 18, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - MARK BARCIA - FEBRUARY 6,2023 THROUGH FEBRUARY 24,2023
Date: January 17, 2023DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL LAUFF 3/1/2022
Date: January 11, 2023DEPOSITION OF DARRELL BOURLIER 12/8/2022
Date: January 11, 2023CERTIFICATE - CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY RULE 1.720(E)
Date: January 12, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT AND UNAVAILABILITY
Date: January 13, 2023DEPOSITION OF HEATHER BOURLIER 12/7/2022
Date: January 11, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: January 12, 2023DEPOSITION OF HEIDI CARSTENS 12/7/2022
Date: January 11, 2023DEPOSITION OF MARY MOULTON 3/1/2022
Date: January 11, 2023DEFENDANT'S BWR NORTH PORT LLC D/B/A BUFFALO WINGS AND RINGS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2023DISCLOSURE - PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS OPINION DISCLOSURE
Date: January 06, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CAITLIN BALESTRO - 12/19/2022 @ 01:00 PM
Date: December 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - PIERRE RICHARD LOUIS - SERVED - 12/15/2022
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/11/2023 @ 02:30 PM
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL/NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - FEBRUARY 20,2023 @ 1:30PM
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JAIMI FILKINS - 12/01/2022 @ 01:00 PM
Date: November 30, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION MERCEDES BARCIA
Date: November 10, 2022RE-NOTICE - RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PIERRE RICHARD LOUIS - 03/02/2023 @ 02:00 PM
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION TAYLOR GREEN
Date: November 10, 20228/16/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/16/2021
Date: May 17, 20249/22/2022
Date: May 04, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 13, 20248/15/2022
Date: May 04, 20248/10/2022
Date: May 07, 20245/18/2022
Date: May 10, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/3/2023
Date: May 03, 20593/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/11/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/27/2022
Date: May 15, 20247/12/2021
Date: May 10, 20245/17/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/19/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/17/2022
Date: May 04, 20249/9/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/13/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/21/2022
Date: May 01, 20247/12/2022
Date: May 06, 20247/15/2022
Date: May 02, 20246/3/2022
Date: May 03, 20248/16/2022
Date: May 02, 20246/16/2021
Date: May 02, 202412/3/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/8/2021
Date: May 17, 202412/3/2021
Date: May 03, 20677/27/2022
Date: May 08, 20241/7/2022
Date: May 03, 20243/23/2022
Date: May 16, 202412/13/2021
Date: May 04, 20246/2/2022
Date: May 01, 20243/21/2022
Date: May 16, 20246/23/2021
Date: May 05, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/29/2021
Date: May 10, 20247/19/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/15/2021
Date: May 04, 202411/17/2021
Date: May 04, 202412/15/2021
Date: May 04, 20247/19/2021
Date: May 04, 20243/30/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/6/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/18/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/23/2022
Date: May 04, 202411/18/2021
Date: May 05, 20247/21/2021
Date: May 05, 20241/7/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/12/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/14/2021
Date: May 04, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 03, 19777/10/2023
Date: May 03, 205610/5/2022
Date: May 12, 202411/16/2022
Date: May 11, 202411/23/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/13/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/25/2023
Date: May 02, 20247/10/2023
Date: May 06, 20247/7/2023
Date: May 16, 20247/10/2023
Date: May 23, 20247/6/2023
Date: May 03, 20427/5/2023
Date: May 03, 20597/7/2023
Date: May 03, 20247/7/2023
Date: May 12, 20247/6/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/16/2021
Date: May 04, 20249/23/2022
Date: May 02, 202412/7/2021
Date: May 04, 20248/9/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/17/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/25/2023
Date: May 04, 20242/22/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/6/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/23/2023
Date: May 03, 202411/16/2021
Date: May 02, 202412/15/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/2/2023
Date: May 07, 202410/17/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 03, 202411/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20246/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/26/2022
Date: May 04, 202411/2/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/7/2023
Date: May 06, 20248/2/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 08, 20241/25/2023
Date: May 03, 20246/2/2022
Date: May 05, 20242/28/2023
Date: May 11, 20244/12/2023
Date: May 21, 202410/20/2022
Date: May 03, 20248/16/2022
Date: May 04, 202411/22/2021
Date: May 18, 20248/10/2022
Date: May 06, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 03, 20712/28/2023
Date: May 04, 20247/27/2022
Date: May 17, 20244/20/2022
Date: May 02, 20243/10/2022
Date: May 12, 202412/10/2021
Date: May 04, 20243/1/2023
Date: May 04, 20246/22/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/27/2022
Date: May 07, 202410/10/2022
Date: May 13, 20241/6/2023
Date: May 07, 20243/23/2022
Date: May 04, 20246/2/2022
Date: May 12, 202410/27/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/9/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/8/2023
Date: May 04, 20249/8/2022
Date: May 08, 20249/12/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/3/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/30/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 06, 20243/8/2023
Date: May 02, 202412/15/2022
Date: May 06, 20241/17/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/8/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/20/2022
Date: May 06, 202410/26/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/14/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/20/2021
Date: May 03, 20244/7/2023
Date: May 08, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 04, 20247/2/2021
Date: May 06, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 03, 202410/28/2021
Date: May 09, 20243/3/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/26/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/1/2023
Date: May 02, 202412/15/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/4/2022
Date: May 04, 202410/21/2022
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2072 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2071 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2068 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2067 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2059 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2059 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2058 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2058 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2056 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.