Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cabrera, Jesus, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Dean, William A, against Hollywood Property Investments Llc, Larkin Community Hospital Inc, Michel, Jack, Md, Rehabilitation Center At Hollywood Hills Llc, represented by Allison, Julie Wynne, Ullman, Kirsten K, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Nursing Home Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Jesus Cabrera as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ramon Cabrera, who passed away on July 15, 2017. The defendants in this case are Jack Michel, M.D., Rehabilitation Center at Hollywood Hills, LLC, and Larkin Com...
Request for Admissions
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 25, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 25, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 25, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 20, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 07, 2019Notice of Service
Date: January 25, 2018Response to Motion to Compel
Date: June 14, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Change of Address
Date: April 24, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 05, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: August 14, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 24, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 24, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 27, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: October 21, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 27, 2019Agreed Order
Date: November 20, 2019Order
Date: January 07, 2020Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: December 05, 2019Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: February 11, 2020Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: February 11, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 05, 2020Request for Production
Date: March 17, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 17, 2020Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: April 07, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: April 16, 2020Answer to Interrogs
Date: April 16, 2020Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 02, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: July 02, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: July 09, 2020Consent
Date: July 13, 2020Order Resetting
Date: July 15, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: July 07, 2020Agreed Order
Date: July 16, 2020Notice of Mediation
Date: November 02, 2020Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: December 02, 2020Expert Witness List
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: January 15, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 10, 2019Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 14, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: September 24, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: January 08, 2020Notice for/of Trial
Date: March 03, 2020Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: February 11, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 04, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: November 04, 2020Order Resetting
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 07, 2020Mediation Report
Date: December 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting trial |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Michel, Jack, MD Defendant Rehabilitation Center at Hollywood Hills LLC Defendant Larkin Community Hospital Inc |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.