Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thacker Inest, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Orloff Paul, against Earle Hyman Defined Benefit Pension Plan, Halcromb Byron Lamont Aka Byron Halcromb, Mostafa Charity Laura, Reyes Michael Blaise, United Wholesale Mortgate Llc A Michigan Limited Liability Company, (total of 6) See All represented by Altshuler Bruce J, Veiguela Peter J, Weinberg Joel G., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton Courthouse with Maurice A. Leiter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaurice A. Leiter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management145 days |
Filing DateJune 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions229 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseCompton Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 12, 2018Other - - Civil Case Cover Sheet- Unlimited
Date: June 22, 2018Summons
Date: June 22, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 04, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)
Date: February 06, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: February 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 08, 2019Answer
Date: May 06, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT
Date: May 09, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 09, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 24, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 28, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 03, 2019Order - ORDER ON STIPULATION REQUESTING THE COURT CONTINUE
Date: June 03, 2019Answer
Date: September 20, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE THE FIRST AMENDED ACOMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: August 20, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 26, 2019Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND) (AMENDED)
Date: September 23, 2019Answer
Date: September 23, 2019Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 26, 2019Answer
Date: October 21, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: January 14, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 02, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 04, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 30, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: July 31, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: July 31, 2019Answer
Date: January 27, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 20, 2020Answer
Date: February 25, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 02, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 04, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 17, 2020Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION .
Date: March 20, 2020Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: March 25, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 17, 2020Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: September 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PUBLICATI...)
Date: September 24, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 30, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)
Date: December 15, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 07, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 07, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 07, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 12, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 12, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: April 22, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 08, 2022Application - APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2022Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: August 02, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2022
Date: August 24, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/22/2022
Date: September 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: September 22, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 22, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: December 05, 2022Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: March 20, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL ORLOFF RE OSC RE DEFAULT
Date: March 20, 2023Application - APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: March 20, 2023Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: March 20, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: November 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: October 25, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 24, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: November 07, 2019Answer; Filed by: EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff); As to: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant); CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet- Unlimited; Filed by:
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff); As to: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Updated -- Order for Publication .: Filed By: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant); As to: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff); As to: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant); As to: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: BYRON HALCROMB (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB (Defendant); As to: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Default entered as to BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB; On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by INEST THACKER on
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant); CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 22, 2023Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: March 27, 2023Application - APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2023Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: March 27, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 14, 2023Answer Filed by BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Dismiss) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd)) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order for Publication (OF THE SUMMONS UPON ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Emahn Counts (Attorney)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Emahn Counts (Attorney)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant); CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Ord...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant); CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant); CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Deem Admitted Requests for Admission) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant); CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Application (for Judgment) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant); CHARITY LAURA MOSTAFA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment Or Order) Filed by MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: proposed judgment as to defend...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (United Shore Financia...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Ord...))
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...) of )
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to strike the first amended AComplaint)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Declaration (Of Demurring Or Moving Party In Support Of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Deem Admitted Requests for Admission)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Order (ON STIPULATION REQUESTING THE COURT CONTINUE)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice ( of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REQUESTING THE COURT CONTINUE)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: EARLE HYMAN DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: MICHAEL BLAISE REYES (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Application for Judgment; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff); As to: BYRON LAMONT HALCROMB (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Deem Admitted Requests for Admission; Filed by: INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by INEST THACKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging in Support)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; C...))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order for Publication (OF THE SUMMONS UPON ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of ...))
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...))
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (United Shore Financia...))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: proposed judgment as to defend...))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (only as to Defendant Earle Hyman Defined Benefit Pension Plan)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to strike the first amended AComplaint)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Ord...))
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/16/2019)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (Of Demurring Or Moving Party In Support Of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice ( of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of ...))
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Order for Publication (OF THE SUMMONS UPON ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Deem Admitted Requests for Admission)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (only as to Defendant Earle Hyman Defined Benefit Pension Plan)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: proposed judgment as to defend...))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (United Shore Financia...))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Publicati...))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; C...))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging in Support)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REQUESTING THE COURT CONTINUE)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Order (ON STIPULATION REQUESTING THE COURT CONTINUE)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.