Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Lyle, Reginald, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Auxuliary Of Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc., Drs Hosp Of Manteca Inc, Sp Of Manteca Inc, Tenet Health, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Lee, Jayne presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1599 days |
Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: July 05, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: July 05, 2016Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: July 05, 2016Summons issued and filed.
Date: July 05, 2016Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned.
Date: November 08, 2016Case Management Statement filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: December 27, 2016Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/03/2017 08:45 AM .
Date: January 03, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: August 31, 2016Case Management Statement filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 27, 2017Order Appointing Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed.
Date: January 03, 2017Order Appointing Discovery Referee filed by Reginald Lyle, Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc..
Date: December 14, 2017Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 12/14/2017 08:30 AM .
Date: December 14, 2017Case Management Statement filed by Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc..
Date: March 27, 2017Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 04/03/2017 08:45 AM .
Date: April 03, 2017Notice of Entry of Order filed by Abbott, J. Anthony.
Date: April 02, 2018Tentative Ruling published.
Date: May 22, 2017Plaintiff's Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: September 24, 2018Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 12/12/2017 03:17 PM .
Date: December 12, 2017Amended Notice of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: October 17, 2018Recommendation and Order of the Discovery Referee filed by J. Anthony Abbott.
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Entry of Order filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: April 02, 2018Proof of service via U.S. Mail filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: November 16, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc..
Date: October 03, 2018Proof of service filed by Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc..
Date: October 31, 2018Proof of service filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: November 06, 2018Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 16, 2018Order Appointing Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed.
Date: December 28, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: October 12, 2018Minutes finalized for Motion held on 12/28/2018 09:00 AM .
Date: December 28, 2018Minutes finalized for Motion for Leave held on 11/16/2018 09:00 AM .
Date: November 16, 2018Tentative Ruling published.
Date: November 16, 2018Proof of service filed by Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc..
Date: December 14, 2018Proof of service filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: December 20, 2018Tentative Ruling published.
Date: December 27, 2018Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 08, 2019Proof of Personal Service filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 08, 2019Proof of service Via U.S. Mail and E-Mail filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 08, 2019Notice of Hearing Re: Class Certification Motion filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 13, 2019Proof of service Re: Motion to Comply filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 18, 2019Proof of service filed by Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc..
Date: March 14, 2019Proof of service VIA U.S. Mail and E-Mail filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 21, 2019Minutes finalized for Motion held on 03/21/2019 09:00 AM .
Date: March 21, 2019Proof of Personal service filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 21, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: March 20, 2019Proof of service via fed-ex and e-mail filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 29, 2019Proof of personal service re: ex parte application filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: April 30, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: March 27, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: July 05, 2016Summons issued and filed.
Date: July 05, 2016Case Management Statement filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: December 27, 2016Notice of Case Management Conference filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: August 31, 2016Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lyle, Reginald.
Date: July 05, 2016Case Management Statement filed by Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc..
Date: March 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Order on Notice of Related Cases filed by Doctors Hospital Of Manteca, Inc.. Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Melissa A. Huether Regarding Distribution of Settlement filed by Lyle, Reginald. Declaration Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, costs, and class representative Enhancement and final approval of Class Action Settlement and entry of Judgment filed by Lyle, Reginald. Notice of Entry of Order Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 07/28/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.
Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment by Court entered and filed. Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING FILED RECORD SEALED Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Class Representatives Enhancements and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference, Motion for Approval of Class Settlement, Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs held on 11/23/2020 09:00 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Motion for Approval of Class Settlement held on November 23, 2020.
Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs held on November 23, 2020.
Judge: Lee, Jayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.