Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Piazza, Olivia, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Fish, Michael, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff'S Title, Or Any Cloud On Plaintiff'S Title Thereto, Piazza, Eugene, Williams, Victoria, represented by Johnston, Roy N., Lyons, Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeMeo, Bradford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2022 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is requesting the court to make several determinations and orders regarding a real property. The plaintiff is seeking reimbursement for expenses, interest on estate tax, and payments on a promissory note related to the property. The to...
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 08, 202294225Proof01e1e4
Date: March 19, 202494225Amend00de39
Date: March 19, 2024Williams Piazza CMS
Date: March 19, 202494209Refer007e54
Date: March 19, 202494114Notic000b7e
Date: March 18, 202494092ExPar00c91b
Date: March 18, 202494092Memor048f87
Date: March 18, 202494092Notic0303c0
Date: March 18, 202494092Propo017c29
Date: March 18, 202494092Decla022515
Date: March 18, 202493847CaseM000314
Date: March 13, 202492561Proof0011bc
Date: February 23, 202492281Notic008138
Date: February 20, 202492122Reply00628b
Date: February 16, 2024Response to Petition for Instructions
Date: February 08, 202489484Proof00560a
Date: January 05, 2024Complaint
Date: June 08, 2022Summons
Date: June 08, 2022signedPROOF0417
Date: June 09, 2022Answer_to_Complaint_Victoria_Williams
Date: July 08, 2022Cross_Complaint
Date: July 08, 2022Answer_to_Complaint_Eugene_Piazza
Date: July 08, 2022notice pendency of action
Date: July 13, 202288833Memor018bb6
Date: December 21, 202388833Notic0078d3
Date: December 21, 2023Piazza Ntc of Entry
Date: November 21, 2023MSP Reply Declaration
Date: November 21, 2023Reply ISO Ex Parte
Date: November 21, 2023Ex Parte App to Replace- Prop Order
Date: November 21, 202387031Decla00a68d
Date: November 21, 2023POS_OF_NoticeOfNonavaila_ourtReporters_033022
Date: July 21, 2022Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: August 16, 2022CMS 10-20-22
Date: October 04, 2022CMS_of_Defendants_re_10_20_22_hrg
Date: October 05, 2022ADR Information Sheet
Date: October 07, 2022Substitution_of_Attorney_Eugene_Piazza
Date: January 13, 2023Substitution_of_Attorney_Williams
Date: January 13, 202369917Notic0193d8
Date: January 27, 202369917Subst00ebe9
Date: January 27, 202370483CaseM0018b9
Date: February 07, 2023Substitution_of_attorney_Victoria_Williams
Date: February 07, 2023Substitution_of_attorney_Eugene_Piazza
Date: February 07, 2023Sub of Atty - served
Date: April 10, 2023Signed Motion to Sell
Date: April 12, 2023Proof of Service- Motion to Sell
Date: April 17, 2023Defendants Exhibits A-D ISO Interlocutory Judgment -served
Date: April 18, 202376045Proof02e4e4
Date: May 19, 202376045Decla011d6b
Date: May 19, 202376045Oppos002eb0
Date: May 19, 202376058Decla02cc28
Date: May 19, 202376058Motio0008f8
Date: May 19, 202376058Memor0124bb
Date: May 19, 2023Reply to Opposition
Date: May 25, 202376636Proof00a07f
Date: May 31, 202376925CaseM0049af
Date: June 06, 2023Piazza_Mo_Partition_Order
Date: June 13, 2023Piazza_Mo_Partition_Interloc_Judgment
Date: June 13, 2023Notice of Entry- Interlocutory Order
Date: June 23, 2023Notice of Entry - Order on Mtn for Interlocutory Judgment
Date: June 23, 202379238Reply007a3c
Date: July 19, 202379238Decla01e721
Date: July 19, 2023Opp to Mtn to Enforce Settlement and Decl of Atty ISO
Date: July 12, 2023Piazza- Obj to Reply Decl served
Date: July 25, 20232023 09-06 Piazza CMS
Date: September 06, 202382201CaseM008853
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Cont from 3/28 - case status post motion for approval of final report Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 96213Propo00a659 | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Approving Final Report of Sale of Real Property Located at 7541 Windward Drive, Rohnert Park | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Approval of Final Report of Sale of Real Property Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference continued from 9/21/23 CMC for status of the sale of property Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Final Report | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Motion/OSC | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.