Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Rmb Real Estate Investments 2,Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rowen, Russell Frank, against California Capital Insurance Company, represented by Weisberg, Gene Allen, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
95904Decla037a45
Date: April 12, 202495904Reque054396
Date: April 12, 202495904Decla0274f4
Date: April 12, 202495904Decla01bb80
Date: April 12, 202495904ExPar007100
Date: April 12, 202495904Propo0607b9
Date: April 12, 202495904Proof07dc5c
Date: April 12, 202495904Decla04bb77
Date: April 12, 202460703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_for_New_Trial_Part3
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_for_New_Trial_Part2
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_for_New_Trial_Part1
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240412_Opp_to_Ex_Parte_with_Decl_
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_S_ISO_Mtn_JNOV_Part3
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_S_ISO_Mtn_JNOV_Part2
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_S_ISO_Mtn_JNOV_Part1
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240415_JNOV_Motion
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240413_CCIC_Mtn_for_New_Trial
Date: April 16, 202460703_20240403_CCIC_Ntc_ent_re_Mtn_New_Trial
Date: April 05, 202460703_20240405_Notice_of_Intent_to_File_JNOV_
Date: April 05, 202494406Proof034665
Date: March 21, 202494406Notic02d827
Date: March 21, 202494406Notic01feec
Date: March 21, 202494406Memor0066e4
Date: March 21, 202494125Notic00c7cf
Date: March 18, 202492870Proof021124
Date: February 28, 202492870Lette002095
Date: February 28, 202492376Proof0184d4
Date: February 21, 202492376Stipu029c63
Date: February 21, 202491770Decla03aeab
Date: February 10, 202491770Decla021df6
Date: February 10, 202491770Proof05e109
Date: February 10, 202491770Propo0433f6
Date: February 10, 202491770Decla01116e
Date: February 10, 202491770ExPar00c794
Date: February 10, 202491734ERRAT00f19d
Date: February 09, 202491672Proof04c3c6
Date: February 08, 202491672DECLA031069
Date: February 08, 202491672PLAIN0038d3
Date: February 08, 202491672DECLA02c910
Date: February 08, 202491672DECLA01f952
Date: February 08, 202460703_20240123_Opp_to_Mt_Prejudgment_Interest
Date: February 02, 202460703_20240123_Objection_Declaration_of_Judd
Date: February 02, 202460703_20240125_Objections_to_Proposed_Judgment
Date: January 25, 202490274Judgm001fa0
Date: January 18, 202460703_20220126_Mtn_to_Bifurcate
Date: January 28, 202254974Decla01296b
Date: March 18, 202254974Plain009c54
Date: March 18, 202260703_20220324_Reply_re_Motion_to_Bifurcate
Date: March 24, 202260703_20220323_Ntc_of_Re_pearance_3_25_22_Hrg
Date: March 24, 202289183Proof04e491
Date: December 29, 202389183DECLA0248ee
Date: December 29, 202389183MEMOR010776
Date: December 29, 202389183Motio00dd4a
Date: December 29, 2023SCV_267840_20231221_RMB_Pltf_s_Attorney_Fees
Date: December 22, 202360703_20231212_Mehrtens_Depo_Objections
Date: December 14, 202360703_20231212_Mehrtens_Counter_Designations
Date: December 14, 202387787OPPOS007bd6
Date: December 05, 202387371PLAIN00c379
Date: November 28, 202387281Proof02fbe2
Date: November 27, 202387281PLAIN016168
Date: November 27, 202387281PLAIN00c57b
Date: November 27, 202360703_20220829_Ex_Parte_re_Trial_Final
Date: August 29, 202260703_20220829_Ex_Parte_Trial_Proposed_Order
Date: August 29, 2022brief
Date: September 29, 2022SF112705.4292198.Proof of Service
Date: September 29, 2022stip
Date: September 29, 2022SCV_267840_20220929_RMB_ief_Phase_1_3_4_1_2_
Date: September 29, 2022Errata
Date: September 30, 2022SF113411.4308035.RMB Reply Brief
Date: October 04, 202260703_20220930_Reply_to_Pl_Trial_Brief
Date: October 04, 2022SF118926-statement
Date: November 09, 2022SF118926-statement2
Date: November 09, 202260703_20221115_Ex_Parte_re_Oral_Argument
Date: November 15, 2022SCV_267840_RMB_Real_Esta__tement_of_Decision_2
Date: November 28, 2022SCV_267840_20221221_RMB_tatement_of_Decision
Date: December 22, 202260703_20230111_POS_of_Depo_Subpoena_Ken_Taub
Date: January 11, 202369961Decla01b689
Date: January 27, 202369961ExPar00a85f
Date: January 27, 202369961Proof03e9cf
Date: January 27, 202369961Propo02be61
Date: January 30, 202370354Proof0390ad
Date: February 03, 202370354MEMOR01875b
Date: February 03, 202370354DECLA028caa
Date: February 03, 202370354NOTIC001f05
Date: February 03, 202370352ExPar007a94
Date: February 03, 202370352Proof03fad5
Date: February 03, 202370352Decla016c02
Date: February 03, 202370352Propo025258
Date: February 06, 202370638JOINT0031a1
Date: February 09, 202370638Proof0242f9
Date: February 09, 202370724Stipu0099a0
Date: February 10, 202370724Proof02ff32
Date: February 10, 202370767DECLA01e477
Date: February 11, 202370767JOINT007f17
Date: February 11, 202370767Proof03bf37
Date: February 11, 202370724PROPO01c41b
Date: February 14, 202370767DECLA01e477
Date: February 14, 202370767PROPO027a3d
Date: February 14, 2023SF133120 Declaration
Date: February 16, 202371784Cover015dd1
Date: March 02, 202371784Proof02e37c
Date: March 02, 202376863Propo0426a0
Date: June 06, 202376863Memor02a7e5
Date: June 05, 202376863Stipu01e925
Date: June 05, 202376863Decla03c2b0
Date: June 05, 202376863Proof05a603
Date: June 05, 202376863ExPar00a1ad
Date: June 05, 202386312PLAIN01084e
Date: November 08, 202386312PLAIN0490e1
Date: November 08, 202386310MOTIO046722
Date: November 08, 202386310MOTIO019328
Date: November 08, 202386315PLAIN0264d6
Date: November 08, 202360703_20231108_CCIC_s_Statement_of_the_Case
Date: November 08, 202360703_20231108_Proposed_Voir_Dire_Questions
Date: November 08, 202360703_Motion_in_Limine_N_f_Evidence_of_Wealth
Date: November 08, 202386310DECLA02bd4a
Date: November 08, 202386310MOTIO031ca7
Date: November 08, 202386310MOTIO00b0c0
Date: November 08, 202360703_20231107_CCIC_s_Trial_Brief
Date: November 08, 202386317Proof022d50
Date: November 08, 202360703_20231107_CCIC_s_Re_ed_Jury_Instructions
Date: November 08, 202360703_20231107_Special_Verdict_Form
Date: November 08, 202386317PLAIN004f00
Date: November 08, 202386317SIGNE010e80
Date: November 08, 202360703_20231107_CCIC_Witness_List_with_Table
Date: November 08, 202386315PLAIN0004d4
Date: November 08, 202386312PROPO00f8ad
Date: November 08, 202386315PLAIN018ccf
Date: November 08, 202386312PLAIN0326a1
Date: November 08, 202386312PLAIN022bfd
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judgment Notwithstanding Verdict
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judgment Notwithstanding Verdict
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Reset Hearing | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Application Striking Notice of Intent to File Motions or Shortening Time |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 60703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_for_New_Trial_Part3 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 60703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_for_New_Trial_Part2 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 60703_20240415_CCIC_EXHI_for_New_Trial_Part1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.