Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gravelle, April, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gutierrez, Joey, Gutierrez, Juan, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Scott E. Seeley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott E. Seeley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a notice for a small claims hearing in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Barstow District. The case number is SCBA2000374. The plaintiff, April Gravelle, filed a claim on 08/17/2020 for an amount of $10,000...
Proof of Service of Civil Subpoena Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Postdisposition)
Date: April 05, 2021Bankruptcy Discharge
Date: April 20, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Postdisposition)
Date: April 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Order on Declaration of Default in Payments Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: August 24, 2020Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 20, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: October 27, 2020Financial Statements Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Request to Make Payments Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Order on Request to Make Payments Filed
Date: November 23, 2020Comment:
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration re: Default in Payments Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Response to Dec of Default in Pymt of Jdmt Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 29, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 13, 2021Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 22, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 30, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Per our conversation, your Order to Produce Statement of Assets is being returned for the following: -Invalid expiration date for the credit card listed. -Missing judgment creditor & debtor name under "Application For This Order" -Missing attached with the name & address of the second defendant. Please review, correct and resubmit. Thank you. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Received ORAP |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Due to an unsuccessful attempt to reach you on 12/28/21 & 12/30/21 the Order to Produce Statement of Assets is being returned for the following: Missing filing & fax fee. Note: When submitting the MC-005 to charge for incurred fees, please review and check the applicable boxes for the court to proceed with charging your credit card; example, filing fee, fax fee. Additionally, in order for the court to charge for copies and mailing, please indicate this as well. Enclosed is a blank MC-005 for resubmission. |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Documents Received: ORAP VIA FAX-MSG LEFT FOR PLA. FAX COVER SHEET IS INCOMPLETE TO CHARGE FEES. |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: 12/17/2021 minutes |
|
December 17, 2021 | Hearing | ORAP - (SMC-Non-Appealed) Examination of Judgment Debtor Judicial Officer Baxter, James R Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment AS TO JOEY GUTIERREZ | |
December 17, 2021 |
Department B1 - Barstow
Judge: Baxter, James R |
||
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Civil Subpoena Filed | |
November 30, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service of Civil Subpoena Filed View Document Proof of Service of Civil Subpoena Filed | |
November 22, 2021 | Hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): View Document Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment Your SUBP-002 form is not being filed for the following reason: No filing fee authorized for fax fees on MC-005. I attempted to contact the number we have on file but was unable to leave a message. Please contact our office to authorize the fees or re submit your request with authorization on MC-005 form. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.