Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anna King, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Altman, Bryan Charles The Altman Law Group, Daghighian, Sepehr Hackler Daghighian Martino & Novak, Pc, against Hyundai Motor America, represented by Tahsildoost, Soheyl Theta Law Firm, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1043 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Settlement Conference Statement -
Date: September 29, 2017Motion Compel -
Date: November 21, 2017Reply -
Date: December 26, 2017Opposition -
Date: December 18, 2017Opposition -
Date: January 30, 2018Notice Change of Address -
Date: June 29, 2018Attorney Address Change Notice -
Date: September 25, 2018Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: December 26, 2018Order Compel -
Date: February 16, 2018Objection -
Date: December 26, 2018Attorney Association of Counsel -
Date: December 13, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: December 17, 2018Stipulation Order -
Date: December 07, 2018Document Other -
Date: October 22, 2018Notice -
Date: February 16, 2018Motion Summary Adjudication -
Date: October 22, 2018Statement -
Date: December 26, 2018Opposition -
Date: December 26, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 02, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 06, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: January 23, 2018Declaration Supplemental -
Date: January 23, 2018Notice -
Date: January 10, 2018Request Judicial Notice -
Date: October 22, 2018Notice -
Date: November 27, 2018Document Other -
Date: December 26, 2018Brief Trial -
Date: June 20, 2019Statement of Case -
Date: June 21, 2019Witness List -
Date: June 21, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 20, 2019Brief Trial -
Date: June 21, 2019Reply -
Date: January 03, 2019Notice -
Date: January 07, 2019In Limine Motion -
Date: July 01, 2019Settlement Conference Statement -
Date: January 10, 2019In Limine Opposition -
Date: June 26, 2019Document Other -
Date: July 02, 2019Objection -
Date: January 03, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 07, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 15, 2019Order Continuance of Trial -
Date: January 15, 2019Settlement Conference Statement -
Date: June 07, 2019Ex Parte Application -
Date: January 15, 2019Settlement Conference Statement -
Date: June 10, 2019Settlement Conference Statement -
Date: January 11, 2019In Limine Motion -
Date: June 12, 2019In Limine Motion -
Date: June 21, 2019Attorney Association of Counsel -
Date: July 01, 2019Document Other -
Date: June 28, 2019Exhibit List -
Date: July 01, 2019Disqualification CCP170.1 -
Date: July 11, 2019Document Other -
Date: July 11, 2019Declaration -
Date: July 11, 2019Document Other -
Date: July 12, 2019Jury Trial Expense Form -
Date: July 01, 2019Request Judicial Notice -
Date: July 08, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 01, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 10, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 08, 2019Document Other -
Date: July 03, 2019Opposition -
Date: July 09, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 02, 2019Document Other -
Date: July 16, 2019Transcript Filed -
Date: July 15, 2019Disqualification Response by Court -
Date: July 18, 2019Memorandum Costs -
Date: September 18, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 15, 2019Jury Instructions Used & Filed -
Date: July 16, 2019Order -
Date: August 20, 2019Opposition -
Date: October 28, 2019Order Disqualify -
Date: August 28, 2019Judgment After Trial -
Date: September 06, 2019Stipulation -
Date: September 23, 2019Order Tax Costs -
Date: December 03, 2019Opposition -
Date: December 09, 2019Declaration -
Date: November 19, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: November 07, 2019Notice Errata -
Date: December 30, 2019Reply -
Date: November 01, 2019Memorandum Costs -
Date: November 22, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: November 26, 2019Objection -
Date: January 03, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 02, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: November 21, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 09, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 06, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 13, 2020Motion Attorney's Fees -
Date: November 26, 2019Proof Service -
Date: November 19, 2019Declaration -
Date: November 26, 2019Declaration -
Date: December 04, 2019Motion Attorney's Fees -
Date: December 04, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: December 04, 2019Reply -
Date: December 13, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: December 19, 2019Opposition -
Date: December 19, 2019Objection -
Date: December 19, 2019Objection -
Date: December 26, 2019Declaration -
Date: December 19, 2019Reply -
Date: December 27, 2019Reply -
Date: January 03, 2020Opposition -
Date: December 27, 2019Proof Service -
Date: December 26, 2019Notice Entry of Judgment -
Date: November 13, 2019Reply -
Date: December 26, 2019Objection -
Date: December 27, 2019Order Ruling on Submitted Matter -
Date: March 03, 2020Declaration -
Date: December 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Ruling on Submitted Matter - | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Ruling on Submitted Matter | |
February 14, 2020 | Heard: Taken Under Submission | ||
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
February 07, 2020 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.