Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Goetz, James, James Goetz, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Jennifer A Moore, against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Usa Corporation, Glaxo Smith Kline, Llc, Glaxo Smith Kline, Plc, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with Elizabeth D. Laporte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth D. Laporte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management18 days |
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Product Liability (Not Asbest...) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing Of Notice Of Removal Filed
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 23
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Glaxo Smith Kline, PLC, Boehringer Ingelh
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference 09/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Goetz
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Revisited Order on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 08, 2022Separate Statement Filed by: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant)
Date: December 02, 2022Exhibit List Filed by: Sanofi US Services, Inc. (Defendant); Sanofi -Aventis U.S. LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 28, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 18, 2022Minute Order (Court Order The Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice filed by S...)
Date: November 18, 2022RETURNED MAIL Notice of Hearing Filed by: Clerk As to: James Goetz (Plaintiff)
Date: November 04, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service (Subpoena for Personal Appearance) Issued by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00The case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex – Party
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Compliance Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Updated -- Stipulation and Order Regarding Prostate Cancer: Result: Granted Result Date: 08/24/2022
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 15, 2022Minute Order (Compliance Hearing; Case Management Conference)
Date: April 20, 2022The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/06/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Issued by: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 21 - Hon. Evelio Grillo
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/01/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Minute Order (Compliance Hearing; Complex Determination Hearing)
Date: February 03, 2022Correspondence Supplemental Disclosure Filed by: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant)
Date: September 15, 2022Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: October 07, 2020The case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: June 03, 2020Dismissal As to Defendant: Glaxo Smith Kline, PLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Sanofi S.A Ente
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Hearing Dropped from dept: 23 date: 07/10/2020 time: 09:30 AM
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 01, 2020Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 23
Date: June 10, 2020Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 02/02/2022 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing Of Notice Of Removal Filed
Date: June 16, 2020Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 05/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed by: James Goetz (Plaintiff)
Date: December 30, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: James Goetz (Plaintiff)
Date: October 07, 2022Complex Determination Hearing 07/28/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference 09/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: May 29, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Goetz
Date: May 11, 2020Complex Designation Requested
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Minute Order (Court Order The Hearing on Motion - Other Defendants'...)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Order Regarding Schedule for Various Pretrial Deadlines for Goetz Trial Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by: James Goetz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Hearing on Sargon and Dispositive M...)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Order Regarding Schedule for Various Pretrial Deadlines for Goetz Trial Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order (Court Order Hearing on Motion - Other Defendants' Mot...)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by: James Goetz (Plaintiff) New Firm Name: WISNER BAUM, LLP
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order (Court Order Hearing on Motion to Seal Their Motion to Strike ...)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 32, col 39] with Document:35455004
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside of California Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Updated -- Revisited Order on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by: James Goetz (Plaintiff) Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: June 22, 2023NOTE: Deposition Issued and Mailed
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by: James Goetz (Plaintiff) As to: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | Compliance Hearing Re: Dismissal | ||
November 15, 2023 | Compliance Hearing Re: Dismissal | ||
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER RE: SPECIALLY- APPEARING DEFENDANT GSK’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL THE PARTIES’ BRIEFING ON SUMMARY JUDGEMENT MOTIONS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Court Order Motion to Seal SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM; filed by ...) Minute Order |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order re: Court Order Motion to Seal SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM; filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
August 11, 2023 | Hearing on Motion to Seal Specially-Appearing Defendant GSK's Unopposed Notice of Motion and Motion to Seal the Parties' Briefing on Summary Judgment Motions and Motions in Limine; filed by Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant) | ||
July 24, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel RE: Valisure Subpoena; Hearing on...) Minute Order |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2023 Event |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Seal Specially-Appearing Defendant GSK's Unopposed Notice of Motion and Motion to Seal the Parties' Briefing on Summary Judgment Motions and Motions in Limine; filed by Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant) scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2023 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.