Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mark Tirman, Tirman, Mark, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Passport Health Holdings, Llc, Pph Franchise Holdings, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management5 days |
Filing DateMay 02, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Order - Dismissal Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 10, 2021Motion Granted
Date: June 11, 2019Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: June 11, 2019Order re Case Management Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: May 02, 2019Case Management Conference 07/16/2019 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: May 07, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 11, 2019Notice of Posting complex case fees Filed
Date: June 21, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: July 11, 2019Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: September 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mark Tirman
Date: May 02, 2019Exhibit Stipulation and Order|Proof of service
Date: July 30, 2019Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 02, 2019Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted
Date: July 31, 2019Proof of Service on Complaint As to PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: May 09, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 11, 2019Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 11, 2019Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: November 12, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: December 12, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: February 26, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: July 18, 2019Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: August 06, 2019First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Declaration Regarding Informal Discovery Conference Filed
Date: December 12, 2019Proof of Service by Mail Re: Joint Complex Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 26, 2020Case Management Statement of Mark Tirman Filed
Date: April 27, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Joint Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 27, 2020Case Management Statement of Mark Tirman Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 28, 2021Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 30, 2020Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Proof of Service CMC Filed
Date: April 30, 2020Case Management Statement of Mark Tirman Filed
Date: June 05, 2020Proof of Service by Mail on Pltff's Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 05, 2020Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: October 08, 2020Motion for Class Certification Filed for Plaintiff
Date: March 01, 2021Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration
Date: March 01, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: May 11, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: March 01, 2021Motion for Class Certification Denied
Date: May 11, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 01, 2021Objections to Evidence
Date: April 28, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 11, 2021Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)
Date: December 14, 2021Order re: Compliance Hearing Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)
Date: February 22, 2022Order re: Compliance Hearing Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 22, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of ...)
Date: December 10, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 10, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of ...)
Date: December 03, 2021Case did not settle. Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 15, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 31, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 31, 2021Plaintiff's Complex Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Order Denying Motion for Class Certification Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 11, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 11, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 16, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 16, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 01, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: December 01, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 09, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 09, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 12, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 12, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 14, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 14, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 17, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 17, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 03, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 03, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 12, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 12, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 27, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 27, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 13, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 13, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 16, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 16, 2019Other - (*Judge's Memo To Clerk - PTSC) Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 15, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC, Passport Health Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC, Passport Health Holdings, LLC
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Informal Discovery Conference Filed
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Re: Joint Complex Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Joint Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mark Tirman Filed
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC, Passport Health Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service CMC Filed
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC, Passport Health Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail on Pltff's Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mark Tirman Filed
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mark Tirman Filed
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition otion for Class Certification Filed
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification Filed
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Evidence in support of Deft PPH Opposition to Pltff's Motion for Class Certification Filed
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC, Passport Health Holdings, L
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Plaintiff's Complex Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Order Denying Motion for Class Certification Filed
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification Denied
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC, Passport Health Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mark Tirman
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference 07/16/2019 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for PPH Franchise Holdings, LLC, Passport Health Holdings, LLC
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting complex case fees Filed
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Mark Tirman - Proof of service
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.