Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gwen R. Sykes, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Hab Siam, against Douglas Sykes, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2003 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 26, 2004Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Granted
Date: December 23, 2003Opposition Motion Compel Prod of Doc Filed
Date: March 01, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 17, 2003Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: March 16, 2004Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: January 16, 2004Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Date: February 23, 2004Motion to Quash Denied
Date: January 26, 2004Motion to Compel Production of Documents Filed for Defendant
Date: February 23, 2004Declaration in Support Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions Filed
Date: March 11, 2004Exhibit
Date: March 11, 2004Declaration in Opposition Filed by Gwen R. Sykes
Date: March 01, 2004Declaration in Reply
Date: March 11, 2004Proposed Order Received
Date: March 26, 2004Motion to Compel (Motion) - Granted in Part
Date: March 16, 2004Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories Filed for Defendant
Date: May 27, 2004Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: February 23, 2004Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: May 14, 2004Declaration in Support Steven B. Piser
Date: February 23, 2004Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions
Date: February 23, 2004Opposition Motion to Compel Answers... Filed
Date: March 01, 2004Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: June 11, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 27, 2004Motion to Compel Production of Documents Granted
Date: March 16, 2004Proposed Order Filed
Date: March 26, 2004Letter re - Dropping 6/01/04 motion Filed
Date: May 14, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: May 06, 2004Substitution of Attorney Filed for Gwen R. Sykes
Date: May 12, 2004Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: May 06, 2004Miscellaneous Mediator Selected Filed
Date: April 15, 2004Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: May 14, 2004Evidence in Support of Motion
Date: June 16, 2004Proof of Service on Motion
Date: June 17, 2004Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 18, 2004Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: June 16, 2004Non-Opposition to Motion Filed by Gwen R. Sykes
Date: July 02, 2004Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed
Date: June 24, 2004Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: July 12, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 16, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 14, 2004Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 16, 2004Proposed Order
Date: May 06, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: May 14, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: May 14, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: May 27, 2004Separate Statement
Date: May 27, 2004Letter dated June 02, 2004 Received
Date: June 02, 2004Letter dated - 6/2/04 requesting dropping of 6/18/04 hearing Received
Date: June 03, 2004Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted
Date: July 12, 2004Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 07, 2004Motion to Bifurcate/Sever Issues Filed for Defendant
Date: July 26, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 11, 2004Proof of Service Application re: Order Shortening Time- Granted Filed
Date: August 17, 2004Proof of Service Response to Form Interrogatories Filed
Date: July 12, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: June 11, 2004Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Douglas Sykes
Date: June 16, 2004Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 18, 2004Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories Granted
Date: June 18, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: August 10, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 10, 2004Proof of Service Response to Special Interrogatories Filed
Date: July 12, 2004Proof of Service
Date: July 02, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 26, 2004Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: June 23, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: July 26, 2004Separate Statement
Date: August 10, 2004Proposed Order
Date: August 10, 2004Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: August 13, 2004Proof of Service
Date: August 17, 2004Proof of Service
Date: August 18, 2004Motion to Compel Physical/Mental Examination Filed for Plaintiff
Date: August 10, 2004Proof of Service by Mail and by Fax Filed
Date: August 24, 2004Proposed Order
Date: August 18, 2004Declaration in Reply supplemental
Date: August 26, 2004Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: August 20, 2004Settlement Conference Statement of Gwen R. Sykes Filed
Date: September 02, 2004Proposed Order
Date: July 26, 2004Proposed Order Application
Date: August 13, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: August 10, 2004Proof of Service on Motion
Date: August 10, 2004Motion for Attorney Fees Filed for Defendant
Date: August 13, 2004Declaration in Support Application
Date: August 13, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 13, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: August 26, 2004Supplemental Declaration in Support Filed
Date: August 26, 2004Declaration in Support
Date: August 13, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: August 17, 2004Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: August 13, 2004Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 31, 2004Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 07, 2004Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Taken Under Submission
Date: August 31, 2004Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: August 13, 2004Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Gwen R. Sykes
Date: August 24, 2004Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 17, 2004Proposed Order
Date: August 17, 2004Application Re: Order Shortening Time Denied
Date: August 24, 2004Proposed Order Application
Date: August 24, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: August 24, 2004Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 24, 2004Proof of Service
Date: August 24, 2004Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 26, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: August 26, 2004Motion for Attorney Fees Taken Under Submission
Date: August 31, 2004Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gwen R. Sykes
Date: July 15, 2003Proof of Service on Motion
Date: August 20, 2003Answer to Complaint Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: September 11, 2003Initial Case Management Conference 11/24/2003 03:00 PM D- 104
Date: September 15, 2003Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: August 11, 2003Proof of Service on Motion
Date: December 17, 2003Proposed Order
Date: December 17, 2003Case Management Statement of Douglas Sykes Filed
Date: November 10, 2003Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 03, 2003Motion to Quash Granted
Date: October 03, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 03, 2003Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 24, 2003Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 24, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: November 24, 2003Proposed Order Stipulation and Order
Date: December 12, 2003Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: July 15, 2003Proposed Order
Date: August 20, 2003Declaration of Steven B. Piser Filed
Date: January 16, 2004Declaration in Opposition
Date: March 01, 2004Motion to Quash Filed
Date: August 20, 2003Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: September 22, 2003Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 20, 2003Separate Statement
Date: August 20, 2003Rejection Letter Issued on Other Exparte
Date: October 28, 2003Case Management Statement of Gwen R. Sykes Filed
Date: November 10, 2003Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: March 01, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: March 11, 2004Proof of Service CMC Filed
Date: November 10, 2003Exhibit
Date: March 11, 2004Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Filed:
Date: December 12, 2003Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support in Opposition to Motion to Quash Filed
Date: January 16, 2004Motion to Quash Filed
Date: December 17, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 26, 2004Separate Statement
Date: December 17, 2003Declaration Filed by Gwen R. Sykes
Date: March 01, 2004Motion to Quash Denied
Date: 2004-01-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: 2003-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service CMC Filed
Date: 2003-11-10T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Compel Answers... Filed
Date: 2004-03-01T00:00:00Declaration in Support Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions Filed
Date: 2004-03-11T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2004-03-26T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2003-10-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: 2004-03-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Filed:
Date: 2003-12-12T00:00:00Declaration of Steven B. Piser Filed
Date: 2004-01-16T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition Filed by Gwen R. Sykes
Date: 2004-03-01T00:00:00Opposition Motion Compel Prod of Doc Filed
Date: 2004-03-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2004-08-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Granted
Date: 2003-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed
Date: 2003-08-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous Mediator Selected Filed
Date: 2004-04-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Production of Documents Filed for Defendant
Date: 2004-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Douglas Sykes Filed
Date: 2003-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: 2004-02-23T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: 2003-09-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support in Opposition to Motion to Quash Filed
Date: 2004-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2004-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2004-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2004-05-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Gwen R. Sykes
Date: 2004-03-01T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-01-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Production of Documents Granted
Date: 2004-03-16T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Other Exparte
Date: 2003-10-28T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2003-11-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed
Date: 2003-12-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash Granted
Date: 2003-10-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gwen R. Sykes
Date: 2003-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2003-11-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Gwen R. Sykes
Date: 2004-05-12T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2003-07-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories Filed for Defendant
Date: 2004-05-27T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: 2003-09-11T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/24/2003 03:00 PM D- 104
Date: 2003-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) - Granted in Part
Date: 2004-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gwen R. Sykes Filed
Date: 2003-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service Response to Form Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2004-07-12T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2004-03-26T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2004-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service Response to Special Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2004-07-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted
Date: 2004-07-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories Granted
Date: 2004-06-18T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed for Defendant
Date: 2004-08-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2004-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: 2004-06-11T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/07/2004 02:00 PM D- 136
Date: 2004-05-18T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: 2004-08-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Douglas Sykes
Date: 2004-06-16T00:00:00Non-Opposition to Motion Filed by Gwen R. Sykes
Date: 2004-07-02T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Document Requests and Production Filed
Date: 2004-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: 2004-05-14T00:00:00Letter dated June 02, 2004 Received
Date: 2004-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2004-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service Application re: Order Shortening Time- Granted Filed
Date: 2004-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2004-06-17T00:00:00Letter dated - 6/2/04 requesting dropping of 6/18/04 hearing Received
Date: 2004-06-03T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-06-18T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate/Sever Issues Filed for Defendant
Date: 2004-07-26T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Gwen R. Sykes
Date: 2004-08-24T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: 2004-08-13T00:00:00Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2004-08-20T00:00:00Letter re - Dropping 6/01/04 motion Filed
Date: 2004-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Physical/Mental Examination Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2004-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed
Date: 2004-06-24T00:00:00Billing Notice Filed
Date: 2004-10-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2004-08-24T00:00:00Objection to evidence submitted by plaintiff in opposition to motion for summary judgment Filed
Date: 2004-08-27T00:00:00Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: 2004-10-25T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2004-09-07T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-08-31T00:00:00Judgment Summary Filed
Date: 2004-09-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: 2004-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: 2004-08-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Taken Under Submission
Date: 2004-08-31T00:00:00Memo to Case $325 for preparation of reporter's transcript on appeal Filed
Date: 2004-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2004-10-25T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-09-07T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees - Dropped
Date: 2004-09-08T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2004-08-26T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2004-08-26T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Taken Under Submission
Date: 2004-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: June 20, 2007Application Re: Order Shortening Time Denied
Date: 2004-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2004-09-23T00:00:00Remittitur Filed
Date: May 01, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2004-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Certification of Record Filed
Date: 2005-01-24T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal of Gwen R. Sykes Filed
Date: February 02, 2005Settlement Conference Statement of Gwen R. Sykes Filed
Date: 2004-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail and by Fax Filed
Date: 2004-08-24T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal of Gwen R. Sykes Filed
Date: January 27, 2005Reminder Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2004-12-03T00:00:00Designation of Record Filed
Date: 2004-10-28T00:00:00Designation of Record Filed
Date: 2004-10-18T00:00:00Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2004-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Gwen R. Sykes
Date: 2004-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed
Date: May 18, 2005Order from DCA Filed
Date: February 23, 2006Reminder Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2004-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: April 19, 2005Opinion of District Court of Appeals Filed
Date: January 26, 2006Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Granted
Date: 2004-09-08T00:00:00Memo of Costs Filed for Douglas Sykes
Date: May 24, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.