Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tzankov, Victor R, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Gilleece Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2022 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for an order for turnover of personal property belonging to the estate of Betty J. Turner. The petitioners, Kendall F. Turner and Kelly J. Turner, are the sons and heirs of Betty J. Turner. The factual background of the c...
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 23, 2024Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 07, 2022Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: July 27, 2022Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 12, 2023Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: March 24, 2022Ex Parte Petition
Date: August 30, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 18, 2023Statement of Disqualification of Judge filed - CCP170.1
Date: September 20, 2022Declaration re:
Date: January 02, 2024Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: July 14, 2022Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: August 29, 2022Declaration re:
Date: December 04, 2023Declaration re:
Date: October 12, 2023Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Declaration re:
Date: December 04, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 17, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 08, 2024Proof of Service
Date: October 18, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 19, 2023Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: May 15, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 18, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Objection Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Rejection of Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: November 03, 2022Proof of Service
Date: June 13, 2023Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion re: filed
Date: January 02, 2024Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: September 06, 2022Exhibits List Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Motion Filed Re:
Date: January 02, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 08, 2024Declaration re:
Date: October 12, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 14, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: September 01, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 28, 2023Order Appointing Special Administrator Filed
Date: May 23, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 17, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 22, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 24, 2022Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: September 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 23, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 29, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 20, 2023Objection Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Probate Objections/Oppositon Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Proof of Publication re:
Date: June 14, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: October 18, 2023Exparte Petition Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 12, 2023Initial Pet for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary
Date: March 24, 2022Request Filed Re:
Date: April 13, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 22, 2023Petition for Probate of Will & Letters Testamentary Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 06, 2023Rejection of Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: November 03, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 08, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: October 03, 2022Ex Parte Petition
Date: February 14, 2023Receipt for Will Lodged
Date: February 17, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 08, 2022Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: June 08, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 08, 2024Proof of Service
Date: January 16, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 29, 2023Probate Objections/Oppositon Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Objection Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 16, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Proof of Publication Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: August 30, 2022Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: August 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION OF JAMES T LEE IN OPPOSITION TO VICTOR TZANKOV'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENT TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; SUPPLEMENT TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES VIA FAX (43) |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed OBJECTION TO REMOTE APPEARANCE |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service OBJECTION |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received PROOF OF SERVICE VIA FAX (2) |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE VIA FAX (5) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.