Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mcconaghy, Julia, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Damian Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDamian Garcia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Order Approving Final Accounting Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: September 07, 2023Initial Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Proof of Publication Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Proof of Publication Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Order Appointing Personal Representative
Date: April 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 28, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 20, 2022Surety Bond Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Letters Issued
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: September 16, 2022Inventory and Appraisal Not Filed- Hearing Set
Date: September 29, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 21, 2022Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: April 11, 2023Accounting Report Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 08, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 13, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 18, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 13, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: October 06, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Final Accounting Filed Order Signed for Hearing on Petition for Final Distribution and Waiver of Accounting. |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Hearing on Decedents Estate /Trust |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Verified Supplement to Petition for Final Distribution and Waiver of Accounting. |
|
October 19, 2023 |
Department F1 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): CAN NOT FILE DOCUMENTS ON THE SAME DAY OF THE HEARING |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to be filed | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Accounting Approved FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO EX PARTE APPLICATION SERVED ON 09/15/23 TO COLONIAL SURETY COMPANY VIA MAIL |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO EX PARTE APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.