Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Corrales, Gilbert, Corrales, Lorraine, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Gilleece Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2011 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time15 days |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 08, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 12, 2022Petition (Probate) Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 01, 2019Declaration re:
Date: January 11, 2024Comment:
Date: October 03, 2011Declaration re:
Date: October 12, 2021Accounting Report Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 26, 2011Objection Filed
Date: July 23, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: July 31, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: September 03, 2020Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: September 23, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 04, 2020Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Reply Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 02, 2024Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 14, 2021Notice Filed re:
Date: March 24, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Response to Opposition (Reply)
Date: October 17, 2022Objection Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 06, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 11, 2011Objection Filed
Date: September 25, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 14, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: October 11, 2011Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: March 09, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: November 30, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 17, 2021Probate Objections/Oppositon Filed
Date: February 25, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 25, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2022Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 24, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 13, 2022Ex Parte Application Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Ex Parte Filed
Date: September 26, 2011Order Filed Re:
Date: July 11, 2022Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: September 26, 2011Motion Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2022Accounting Report Filed
Date: March 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 12, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 11, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Accounting Report Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 27, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 11, 2023Response to Opposition (Reply)
Date: October 17, 2022Response to Opposition (Reply)
Date: October 17, 2022Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 20, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 27, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Declaration re:
Date: January 11, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Probate Objections/Oppositon Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 28, 2023Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 13, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 26, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Supplemental Filed (Imaged)
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 13, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: December 31, 2019Response to Opposition (Reply)
Date: October 17, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 07, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Declaration re:
Date: July 31, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 14, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 12, 2011Declaration Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Brief Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Points and Authorities Filed
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Motion Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 10, 2024Proof of Service
Date: August 30, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Motion
Date: January 13, 2022Accounting Report Filed
Date: September 01, 2020Stipulation Filed re:
Date: August 15, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 30, 2023Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
January 17, 2024 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENT DECLARATION OF LOUIE A RUIZ |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed Request for Judicial Notice in Support of the Ex Parte Application |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: LORRAINE CORRALES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application Filed TO TRANSFER, COORDINATE AND CONSOLIDATE MATTERS |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: LOUIE A. RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Substitution of Attorney |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed *Amended* of related case |
|
December 28, 2023 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.