Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa National Association As Trustee For Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporationmortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-Ap3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Suarez Abreu, Yimell Marie, against Citibank Na, Diane E Knight Aka Diane Knight, Madison Home Equities Inc, represented by Farber, Sheldon, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: January 01, 2015NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: November 17, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 06, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: November 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 01, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 01, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: July 10, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: May 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 01, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 01, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: September 07, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: September 26, 2023FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 01, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 02, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: August 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 25, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 07, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 17, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 03, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 02, 2023FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: August 08, 2023TERMS OF SALE
Date: September 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
September 26, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
September 26, 2023 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
September 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Affidavits of Publication and Posting - Filed by FNQ |
||
August 25, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 08, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
August 07, 2023 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
August 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #8) | ||
August 02, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.