Related Content
in San Bernardino County
Case
In re:Espinoza Print
Jun 27, 2024 |
Tanada, Stephanie |
Petition for Change of Name |
Petition for Change of Name |
CIVSB2422581
Ruling
DOBBINS, et al. vs. CARE OPTIONS MANAGEMENT PLANSAND SUPPORT
Jul 25, 2024 |
CVCV20-0194615
PLANSAND SUPPORT
Case Number: CVCV20-0194615
This matter is on calendar for review regarding trial re-setting. The parties have filed a Joint Case
Management Statement which requests a continuance to explore informal resolution and a second
mediation. In light of the foregoing, this matter is continued to Monday, September 9, 2024, at
9:00 a.m. in Department 64. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
People vs $ 1,108,400 U.S. Currency
Jul 12, 2024 |
20CV-03387
20CV-03387 People v. $1,108,400 U.S. Currency
Order to Show Cause re Name Change
Appearance required. Parties who wish to appear remotely must contact the clerk of the
court at (209) 725-4111 to seek permission and arrange for a remote appearance. Appear
to address status of case.
Ruling
DOBBINS, et al. vs. CARE OPTIONS MANAGEMENT PLANSAND SUPPORT
Jul 24, 2024 |
CVCV20-0194615
PLANSAND SUPPORT
Case Number: CVCV20-0194615
This matter is on calendar for review regarding trial re-setting. The parties have filed a Joint Case
Management Statement which requests a continuance to explore informal resolution and a second
mediation. In light of the foregoing, this matter is continued to Monday, September 9, 2024, at
9:00 a.m. in Department 64. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
The People of the State of California vs. $12,276.00 U.S. Currency
Jul 14, 2024 |
24CV-0204435
U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 24CV-0204435
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of return of funds. At the last hearing on
June 10, 2024, the People advised the Court that the underlying criminal case was dismissed. The
People further advised they intended to dismiss this case. The Court directed return of the funds
to the Claimant. A Motion to Dismiss has been filed. However, the return of funds has not been
addressed. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to address the status of the return
of funds.
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS. $1000.00
Ruling
The People of the State of California vs. $1000.00 U.S. Currency
Jul 19, 2024 |
22CV-0199795
U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 22CV-0199795
This consolidated asset forfeiture matter is on calendar for review regarding status of criminal
proceedings and amended petition. On June 10, 2024, the People advised the Court that Judgment
and Sentencing in the underlying criminal matter was set for June 13, 2024. No amended petition
has been filed. No status report has been filed. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar
to provide the Court with a status of the criminal proceeding and amended petition.
Ruling
The People of the State of California vs. $12,276.00 U.S. Currency
Jul 16, 2024 |
24CV-0204435
U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 24CV-0204435
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of return of funds. At the last hearing on
June 10, 2024, the People advised the Court that the underlying criminal case was dismissed. The
People further advised they intended to dismiss this case. The Court directed return of the funds
to the Claimant. A Motion to Dismiss has been filed. However, the return of funds has not been
addressed. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to address the status of the return
of funds.
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS. $1000.00
Ruling
DOBBINS, et al. vs. CARE OPTIONS MANAGEMENT PLANSAND SUPPORT
Jul 21, 2024 |
CVCV20-0194615
PLANSAND SUPPORT
Case Number: CVCV20-0194615
This matter is on calendar for review regarding trial re-setting. The parties have filed a Joint Case
Management Statement which requests a continuance to explore informal resolution and a second
mediation. In light of the foregoing, this matter is continued to Monday, September 9, 2024, at
9:00 a.m. in Department 64. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
DOBBINS, et al. vs. CARE OPTIONS MANAGEMENT PLANSAND SUPPORT
Jul 22, 2024 |
CVCV20-0194615
PLANSAND SUPPORT
Case Number: CVCV20-0194615
This matter is on calendar for review regarding trial re-setting. The parties have filed a Joint Case
Management Statement which requests a continuance to explore informal resolution and a second
mediation. In light of the foregoing, this matter is continued to Monday, September 9, 2024, at
9:00 a.m. in Department 64. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.