Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vystar Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Glass, Michelle Leigh, against Brown, Cynthia S, Hurston, Constance A, Lakewood Improvement Associati, Unknown Spouse Of Constance A, Unknown Spouse Of Cynthia S Br, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 06, 2019SUMMONS
Date: September 06, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY GLASS
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 06, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: September 06, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED CYNTHIA S BROWN
Date: September 10, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYNTHIA S BROWN
Date: September 10, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: September 10, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CONSTANCE A HURSTON
Date: September 10, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED CONSTANCE A HURSTON
Date: September 10, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED LAKEWOOD IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC
Date: September 10, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: September 10, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: October 07, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: CYNTHIA S BROWN
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: CYNTHIA B BROWN
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYNTHIA S BROWN
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYNTHIA S BROWN
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CONSTANCE ANN HURSTON AKA THE CAT LADY
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CONSTANCE A HURSTON
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VIOLET NORRIS R.A. LAKEWOOD IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: January 02, 2020LETTER FROM LAW OFFICES OF MICHELLE GLASS
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL
Date: January 15, 2020ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 16, 2020HEARING DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 16, 2020NOTICE OF CIVIL ACTION AMENDED - SIGNED (EMAILED TO BRADFORD COUNTY TELEGRPAH)
Date: January 22, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION AMENDED NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: February 10, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION AMENDED NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: February 12, 2020RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT: OBJECTIONS TO EXPEDITED FORECLOSURE AMENDMENT FILED BY CONSTANCE HURSTON
Date: February 27, 2020ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5-14-20 @ 9:30 AM
Date: March 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE
Date: August 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: August 24, 2020Notice Of Hearing
Date: August 24, 2020MTN FOR DEFAULT
Date: August 24, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2020Final Disposition Form
Date: September 18, 2020LETTER FROM LAW OFFICE OF MICHELLE L GLASS PA TO CLERK
Date: September 18, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATOIN OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Sale FOR 12-3-20
Date: September 24, 2020AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Sale
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Sale AMENDED 12-3-2020
Date: September 30, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION AMENDED NOTICE OF SALE FOR 12-3-20
Date: October 22, 2020MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: November 16, 2020ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: November 24, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2020RECEIPT
Date: December 03, 2020MOTION TO REOPEN CASE AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Sale
Date: December 04, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2020Notice Of Hearing 1-20-21 @ 9:30 AM
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Sale
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Sale FOR 4-15-21
Date: March 10, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE-NOTICE OF SALES FOR 4-15-21
Date: April 13, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF SALE FOR 4-15-21
Date: April 14, 2021APPEAL AND REQUEST OF DEFENDANT
Date: April 15, 2021APPEAL AND REQUEST OF DEFENDANTS
Date: April 15, 2021MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT of funds from court registry
Date: May 28, 2021RECEIPT
Date: April 15, 2021RECEIPT COURT REGISTRY FOR REDEMPTION
Date: April 15, 2021LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY GLASS
Date: April 19, 2021ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS APPEALS AND REQUESTS OF DEFENDANTS
Date: April 22, 2021LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY GLASS
Date: July 15, 2021MOTION TO REQUEST RETURN OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS
Date: March 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number M 13464456 | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REQUEST RETURN OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for OTHER CIVIL on 3/24/2022 | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY GLASS | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS-REGISTRY OF COURT FUNDS DISBURSED IN THE AMT OF $147,170.31 PAYABLE TO VYSTAR CREDIT UNION C/O MICHELLE L GLASS, PA CK#1819 DATED 6/4/2021 | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF UNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.