Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dinsmore Marilyn, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Katje September J, against Ocwen Loan Servicing, Onewest Bank A Division Of Cit Bank N.A. A Delaware Corporation And National Banking Association, U.S. Bank National Association As Trustee, represented by Houser Eric Donald, Illman Erin Jane, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with William D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam D. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management209 days |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time689 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: August 10, 2018Notice - OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 10, 2018Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 15, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEMURRER HEARING
Date: March 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 22, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 430.41 RE MEET AND CONFER
Date: April 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF DEMURRER
Date: April 26, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 26, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 26, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CIT BANK, N.A.'S DEMURRER
Date: June 07, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 26, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 03, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: June 14, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 17, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 12, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 19, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: July 25, 2019Request For Copies
Date: July 26, 2019Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: September 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 18, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 19, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: September 23, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 15, 2019Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: October 15, 2019Order - ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: October 17, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MEET AND CONFER FOR DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 06, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 10, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 30, 2020Notice of Lien
Date: January 31, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 04, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 29, 2020Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE TRIAL COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT))
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order (OSC re Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (re meet and confer)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Declaration (Under C.C.P. Section 430.41 Re Meet and Confer)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Demurrer Hearing)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice (of Cancellation of Demurrer Hearing)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Opposition (on Behalf of Plaintiff Marilyn Dynsmore to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Defendant CIT Bank, N.A.'s Demurrer)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (Under C.C.P. Section 430.41 Re Meet and Confer)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Meet and Confer for Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal])
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (To Demurrer To Second Amended Complaint))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Plaintiff's...))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Summons (on Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Meet and Confer for Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Meet and Confer for Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Opposition to Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Order (Sustaining In Part And Overruling In Part Demurrer To Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (-Second)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 19, 2020Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: March 04, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order OSC re Trial Court Delay Reduction Act
Date: August 10, 2018Complaint - VERIFIED UNLIMITED
Date: August 10, 2018Proof of Service by Mail -
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE TRIAL COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT)
Date: October 24, 2018Request For Copies
Date: October 25, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 27, 2018Declaration - Declaration re meet and confer
Date: November 27, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 27, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 23, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 23, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 23, 2019Notice - Notice of Demurrer
Date: January 23, 2019Declaration - Declaration Under C.C.P. Section 430.41 Re Meet and Confer
Date: January 23, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 07, 2019Notice - Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference
Date: March 08, 2019Notice - Notice of Continuance of Demurrer Hearing
Date: March 08, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2019Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: March 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: March 15, 2019Request For Copies
Date: June 24, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 25, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -SECOND
Date: June 25, 2019Request For Copies
Date: June 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 09, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.