Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Altawal, Yarng, Sberlo, Yoel, Trustee For Sberlo Family Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hooshmand, Mark, Uchiyama, Karen Y, against Altawal, Susan, Altawal, Yarng, Does, Sberlo, Yoel, Trustee For Sberlo Family Trust, represented by Hooshmand, Mark, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with JEROME T. BENSON presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 22, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time258 days |
This complaint is a request for rehearing of an unlawful detainer case in the Court of Appeal, First Appellate District. The petitioner, Yarng Altawal, is represented by Mark Hooshmand of Hooshmand Law Group. The respondent is Yoel Sberlo, Trustee fo...
ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL MAR-19-2014
Date: February 25, 2014TRIAL BRIEF
Date: January 28, 2014JURY NOTES RECIEVED DURING TRIAL
Date: February 04, 2014NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT
Date: June 30, 2014JURY NOTES RECIEVED DURING DELIBERATIONS
Date: February 04, 2014APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF APR-10-2015 - APPEAL OF CIVIL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED
Date: April 15, 2015JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN
Date: February 04, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: January 28, 2015CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $1,395.00
Date: September 24, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-31-2014 9:00 AM
Date: January 31, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE TO APPELLANT RE MISSING DOCUMENTS
Date: August 26, 2014APPELLANT NOTIFIED OF REPORTERS ESTIMATE
Date: June 16, 2014DECLARATION OF MARK HOOSHMAND FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: December 12, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: December 10, 2013POS OF DECL OF MARK HOOSHMAND FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG ALTAWAL, SUSAN
Date: December 09, 20132ND REQUEST SENT TO REPORTER FOR ESTIMATE (AMENDED)
Date: May 27, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 28, 2014(PROPOSED) AMENDED WITNESS LIST FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: January 27, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-30-2014 9:00 AM
Date: January 30, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-29-2014 9:00 AM
Date: January 29, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-28-2014 9:00 AM
Date: January 28, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014PROPOSED VOIR DIRE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-27-2014 9:00 AM
Date: January 27, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014(PROPOSED) TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: January 27, 2014(PROPOSED) WITNESS LIST FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: January 27, 2014TRIAL BRIEF
Date: January 27, 2014ORDER TAKING OFF CALENDAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND TERMINATING SANCTIONS
Date: January 10, 2014ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND TO HOLD THEM IN CONTEMPT
Date: January 10, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 04, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: February 25, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: March 06, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 02, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: February 20, 2014DECLARATION OF MARK HOOSHMAND IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 27, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 27, 2013MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014MINUTES FOR FEB-04-2014 9:00 AM
Date: February 04, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: November 27, 2013(PROPOSED) EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014DECLARATION OF MARK HOOSHMAND
Date: May 13, 2014MINUTES FOR FEB-05-2014 9:30 AM
Date: February 05, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014REPORTERS ESTIMATE RECEIVED (DEALBA, BLUM, TSUJIMOTO, & CROW)
Date: June 13, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE TO APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: May 13, 2014(PROPOSED) WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 27, 2014ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION AS TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S CONDUCT DURING DEPOSITIONS
Date: December 16, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: December 20, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: December 17, 2013POS OF OPPOS TO MOOT AND IMPROPER DISCO MTN FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 13, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: December 12, 2013ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 13, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: November 21, 2013POS OF OPPOS TO MOT AND IMPROPER DISCO MTN FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 13, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 08, 2013AMENDED ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 08, 2013OPPOS TO MOOT DISCOVERY MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 08, 2013DECLARATION OF MARK HOOSHMAND FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 08, 2013NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 08, 2013MINUTES FOR MAR-13-2014 9:00 AM
Date: March 13, 20141ST REQUEST SENT TO REPORTER FOR ESTIMATE (DEALBA #5709/BLUM #11133)
Date: April 04, 2014ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, SUSAN
Date: August 28, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF 2ND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 11, 2014PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, SUSAN
Date: July 08, 2013ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: August 15, 2013REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOS TO DEMURRER
Date: July 24, 2013JURY INSTRUCTIONS DEFENDANT YARNG ALTAWAL'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: February 19, 2014MINUTES FOR FEB-21-2014 11:00 AM
Date: February 21, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: January 06, 2014MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AS TO PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: February 19, 2014REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 09, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: December 02, 2013SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARK HOOSHMAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: December 02, 2013NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPP OF OPPOS TO MTN TO CONT TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 26, 2013OPPOSITION TO MTN TO CONT TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 26, 2013DECLARATION OF MARK HOOSHMAND FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 26, 2013ORDER FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY POSTING AND CERTIFIED MAIL
Date: June 07, 2013NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: May 22, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SBERLO, YOEL, TRUSTEE FOR SBERLO FAMILY TRUST
Date: October 31, 2013DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: February 25, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: February 25, 2014NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: March 28, 2014NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: April 18, 2014STATEMENT OF DECISION CONCERNING DEFENDANT YARNG ALTAWAL'S ESTOPPEL DEFENSE
Date: March 13, 2014(AMENDED) NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: April 03, 2014NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: March 17, 2014ORDER RE: DEFENDANT AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR YARNG ALTAWAL'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: April 01, 20142ND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 09, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: February 13, 2014(PROPOSED) VERDICT FORM FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: February 04, 2014JURY VERDICT
Date: February 04, 2014MINUTES FOR FEB-03-2014 8:30 AM
Date: February 03, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: February 13, 2014WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: February 13, 2014ORDER RE STIPULATION TO RETURN TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS (BENSON-624).
Date: February 04, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY UCHIYAMA, KAREN Y
Date: January 13, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPENING BRIEF OF APPELLANT YARNG ALTAWAL FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: November 14, 2014PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: May 05, 2015ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT ALTAWAL'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FINALIZE RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: September 09, 2014ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT ALTAWAL'S MOTION TO FINALIZE RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: September 17, 2014NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED (APPELLANT'S BRIEF IS DUE BY NOV-10-2014)
Date: October 09, 2014RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO APPELLATE DEPT (CT 11 VOLS/RT 12 VOLS)
Date: October 08, 2014ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT ALTAWAL'S REQUEST TO EXTEND WORD COUNT
Date: November 12, 2014ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT ALTAWAL'S MOTION TO AUGMENT THE RECORD
Date: January 28, 2015NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE RESPONDENT'S BRIEF(R/B DUE 1/23/15)
Date: January 08, 2015APPELLATE DIVISION JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2015APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: February 13, 2015PETITION FOR TRANSFER FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: May 05, 2015REMITTITUR FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 0)
Date: July 23, 2015ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL FEB-25-2014
Date: February 18, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 13, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: February 18, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: January 27, 2014MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTAWAL, YARNG
Date: January 27, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 0) | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR ISSUED | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR TRANSFER FILED BY APPELLANT ALTAWAL, YARNG | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF APR-10-2015 - APPEAL OF CIVIL JUDGMENT AFFIRMED | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | APPELLATE DIVISION JUDGMENT | |
April 10, 2015 | Hearing |
APPEAL OF CIVIL JUDGMENT
Judge: APPELLATE (ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO PRESIDING) |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-10-2015 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 622 | |
March 20, 2015 | Hearing | APPEAL OF CIVIL JUDGMENT | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF MAR-20-2015 - APPEAL OF CIVIL JUDGMENT CONTINUED TO APR-10-2015 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 622 ON COURTS OWN MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.