Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eclipse Property Management Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Sanchez, Andres, against Does 1 To 10, Ortega, Maria, Umanzor, Wilfredo I, represented by Pro Per, Schoenberg, Anthony P., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions177 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time419 days |
This complaint is an amendment to a legal case filed by Eclipse Property Management Inc. against Wilfredo N. Umanzor and Maria Ortega in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The complaint states that the plaintiff initially desi...
NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: July 24, 2012FEES NOT PAID. ANSWER OF WILFREDO UMANZOR FILED ON 8/9/12 IS STRICKEN. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. (206)
Date: September 11, 2012DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $57.33 FILED BY PLAINTIFF ECLIPSE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.
Date: November 01, 2012DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $57.33 FILED BY PLAINTIFF ECLIPSE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.
Date: October 30, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT UMANZOR, WILFREDO I (SUED AS WILFREDO N)
Date: August 09, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ECLIPSE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.
Date: August 22, 2012NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ECLIPSE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.
Date: August 29, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2012DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: January 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT ORTEGA, MARIA UMANZOR, WILFREDO I (SUED AS WILFREDO N) | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ECLIPSE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. | |
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO DEFENDANT UMANZOR, WILFREDO I (SUED AS WILFREDO N) | |
January 09, 2013 | Hearing |
APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON JAN-09-2013 IN 206, HEARING ON APPLICANT/DEFENDANT WILFREDO UMANZOR'S WAIVER OCOURT FEES AND COSTS. KELLY MATAYOSHI APPEARING FOR DEFENDANT. NO APPEARANCE BY APPLICANT. THE COURT DENIED THE APPLICATION AS TO WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS. DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO BE RE-IMBURSED IS DENIED. ORDER SIGNED, AND ENDORSED-FILED COPY MAILED TO APPLICANT. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
December 26, 2012 | Hearing |
APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | MASTER CALENDAR MOTION ON DEC-26-2012 IN DEPT. 206, WILFREDO UMANZOR'S HEARING ON APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS CONTINUED FROM DEC-26-2012 TO JAN-09-2013, 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. (206) | |
November 27, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
Mtn For Relief Unlawful Detainer Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday November 27,2012. Line 4 - DEFENDANT MARIA ORTEGA and WILFREDO UMANZOR's Motion For Relief. Hearing required. =(501/REQ)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
November 27, 2012 | Hearing |
Mtn For Relief
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.