Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Helland, Patrick, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Collins, Charles Michael, Pro Per, against Bronner, Ray, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard B. Ulmer, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions19 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Case Cycle Time88 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY
Date: March 11, 2008ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME
Date: July 02, 2008ORDER OVERRULING (DEFENDANT RAY BRONNER'S) DEMURRER
Date: March 06, 2008ORDER FIXING COSTS OF ENFORCEMENT OF MONEY JUDGMENT
Date: June 28, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-23-2008 9:45 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: April 23, 2008MINUTES FOR APR-22-2008 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: April 22, 2008MINUTES FOR APR-25-2008 9:15 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: April 25, 2008MINUTES FOR APR-24-2008 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: April 24, 2008EXHIBIT LIST FILED
Date: April 01, 2009WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: April 25, 2008ORDER RE REQUEST TO SET HEARING ON MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST FOR STAY
Date: September 05, 2008NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: April 16, 2008NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: January 31, 2008REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, AS TO DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY
Date: March 12, 2008REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, AS TO DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY
Date: February 14, 2008NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: April 04, 2008EXHIBIT LIST FILED
Date: April 28, 2008JURY VERDICT
Date: April 28, 2008MINUTES FOR APR-28-2008 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: April 28, 2008ORDER SHORTENING TIME (ON HEARING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER - 3/18/08 TO 3/6/08)
Date: February 27, 2008NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $4,908.75 INTEREST, $1,947.55 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK AS TO DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY $11,806.30 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,806.30, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK AS TO DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK AS TO DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK AS TO DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK AS TO DEFENDANT BRONNER, RAY | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,577.88 INTEREST, $460.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELLAND, PATRICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.