Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Won, Pak J., filed a(n) Money case against Ma, Yan Xia, Won, Pak J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2009 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions181 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time828 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2009NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE FOR OEX FILED BY PLAINTIFF WON, PAK J.
Date: March 10, 2010CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED
Date: August 20, 2009ORDER TO RECALL WRIT OF EXECUTION, PER JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL.
Date: July 01, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RECALL WRIT OF EXECUTION SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE WAS RETURNED STATING THAT THEY DID NOT RECEIVED THE WRIT. (SEE POST IT) | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RECALL WRIT OF EXECUTION, PER JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL. | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT RECEIVED AND FILED. | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM PLAINTIFF INFORMING THE COURT THAT HE AND DEFENDANT HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT AND WITHDRAWING HIS CASE AGAINST DEFENDANT YAN XIA MA. FILED BY PLAINTIFF WON, PAK J. | |
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF WON, PAK J. AS TO DEFENDANT MA, YAN XIA A.K.A. YI HAR MA | |
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event | ADDED TO EXHIBIT DESTRUCTION REPORT OF MAR-01-2010 | |
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED MAR-01-2010 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | BENCH LETTER ISSUED FOR APR-22-2010; JUDGMENT DEBTOR YAN XIA MA FAILED TO APPEAR. WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ORDERED ISSUED. BAIL SET AT 500.00. | |
April 22, 2010 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF EXAMINATION CALENDAR
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS OEX CALENDAR OF APR-01-2010 IS CONTINUED TO APR-22-2010 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 506 BENCH LETTER ISSUED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.