Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
A., A., A., D., Ahlheim, Kimberly, A., S., B., B., (total of 62) See All filed a(n) Coordination case represented by Cabraser, Elizabeth Joan, Da Vega, Matthew, De Saint Phalle, Eustace, Eisenberg, Neil Daniel, Hersh, Nancy Lee, (total of 11) See All against Chart Inc., Chart, Inc., Chart Industries, Inc., A Corporation, Chenette, Philip, Conaghan, Joseph, (total of 16) See All represented by Bosman, Erin Mccalmon, Cowden, Marc G, Duffy, John, Holder, James K., Laddon, Tarifa B., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Andrew Y.S. Cheng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryCoordination |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions248 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a declaration by attorney Doris Cheng in support of an ex parte application to amend the plaintiffs' short form complaint for damages in a case involving Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, San Francisco Fertility Centers, an...
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574256. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-18-567717. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-18-565570. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC20-585212. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER CONTINUING JANUARY 18, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 68917638)
Date: January 18, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574293. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-18-570347. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-21-589746. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023MINUTES FOR APR-03-2023 10:00 AM
Date: April 03, 2023ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #69722829)
Date: April 03, 2023ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE (FROM PRESIDING JUDGE GARRETT L. WONG)
Date: October 11, 2019DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLINT IN CGC-20-585210. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585273. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585216. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574307. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #64621309)
Date: January 14, 2020DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585215. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574290. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER CONTINUING MAY 28, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #64671409)
Date: January 29, 2020DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574282. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585277. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585241. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574258. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574295. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574315. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585270. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-570397. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-570136. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-19-573610. (TRANSACTION ID # 69918249)
Date: April 28, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-19-574257. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67938231) FILED BY OTHER PLAINTIFFS' LIAISON COUNSEL
Date: August 16, 2022REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A158155 DIV 1
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE
Date: April 26, 2019ORDER LIFTING STAY
Date: June 13, 2019ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO QUASH (TRANSACTION ID #64522805)
Date: December 12, 2019DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574410. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-18-566130. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585218. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585268. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585302. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE AND SETTING HEARING
Date: April 26, 2019DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585304. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER TERMINATING JCCP (TRANSACTION ID #70797916)
Date: September 05, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66971730) FILED BY DEFENDANT PRELUDE FERTILITY, INC.
Date: September 28, 2021JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67082358) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER AFTER REVIEW OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID #67085735)
Date: November 10, 2021DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574336. (TRANSACTION ID # 69882256)
Date: April 24, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 67253235) FILED BY APPELLANT CHART, INC.
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR OTHER EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF A164120 DIV 1
Date: January 24, 2022ORDER ADVANCING MAY 29, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 64830505)
Date: March 13, 2020CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: January 31, 2022DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-20-585211. (TRANSACTION ID # 69879737)
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 67313375)
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT CHART, INC.
Date: February 18, 2022DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-19-574223. (TRANSACTION ID # 69908417)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-569870. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT
Date: March 14, 2022DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-565616. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-567042. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-565122. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-570145. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: May 10, 2022DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-565882. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-570019. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-19-574260. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-569718. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-19-578083. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-566820. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-19-574252. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-565458. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023ORDER VACATING CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #67805449)
Date: July 08, 2022ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ADD-ON CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 66870141)
Date: August 20, 2021DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-18-565459. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-19-574254. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION IN CGC-19-574251. (TRANSACTION ID # 69909710)
Date: April 27, 2023ORDER AFTER REVIEW OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 65912018)
Date: September 08, 2020NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOHN DUFFY TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY KEVIN RINGEL TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022ORDER RE JULY 12, 2023 HEARING (TRANSACTION ID #70270381)
Date: June 27, 2023ORDER RE JULY 12, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #70334888)
Date: July 07, 2023MINUTES FOR JUL-12-2023 2:00 PM
Date: July 12, 2023ORDER AFTER JULY 12, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #70386660)
Date: July 13, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: September 06, 2023ORDER AFTER REVIEW OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66226714)
Date: January 04, 2021REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A164472 DIV 1) (APPEAL FILED 1/21/22)
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A164472 DIV 1) (APPEAL FILED 1/21/22) | |
October 25, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
September 07, 2023 | Hearing |
INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (HH & DH PACIFIC FERTILITY CENTER, CASE #565215)
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR ON SEP-07-2023 IN DEPT. 613, INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE HELD. NO MINUTES TAKEN. JUDGE ANDREW Y.S. CHENG, CLERK C. BANAYAD, NOT REPORTED (613) | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TERMINATING JCCP (TRANSACTION ID #70797916) | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-25-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR PER COURT ORDER (613) | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER & AMENDED STIPULATON ADOPTING PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED IN COORDINATED PROCEEDING CASE NO. CJC-19-005021 (TRANSACTION ID #70592880) | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (HH & DH VS. PACIFIC FERTILITY CENTER, CASE #565215) HEARING SET FOR SEP-07-2023 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 613 | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MOLLY MORIARTY LANE (TRANSACTION ID # 70502758) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHART INC. (CGC-18-565215) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.