Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Frias, Norma, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Heraldez Law Pc, against Does 1-20, Himnel Usa Incorporated, represented by California Business Lawyer & Company Lawyer, Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Balance Due on Case
Date: August 24, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: September 19, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 22, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 24, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: August 22, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 24, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: September 13, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 22, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 22, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 21, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Objection Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: September 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 27, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 27, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 17, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 05, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 05, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: August 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 24, 2023Objection Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 27, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: November 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: November 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Motion re:
Date: October 31, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 26, 2023Memo of Points & Authorities ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: December 19, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 23, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 15, 2024Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 21, 2023Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: January 24, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 21, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: March 11, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: November 15, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 21, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: December 04, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 16, 2024Notice Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 15, 2024Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: January 16, 2024Notice Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 02, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 26, 2023Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: December 19, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 25, 2024Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 09, 2024Vacated Document re:
Date: March 22, 2024Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: March 11, 2024Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically
Date: April 05, 2024Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: April 17, 2024Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: March 11, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: March 11, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 16, 2024Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 28, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 22, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: March 11, 2024Vacated Document re:
Date: March 22, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 27, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: November 06, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Objection Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Vacated Document re:
Date: January 16, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 22, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 12, 2023Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: March 11, 2024Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 23, 2024Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically
Date: April 05, 2024Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 09, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 11, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: April 10, 2024Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 12, 2024Vacated Document re:
Date: March 22, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: December 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: December 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: January 05, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: January 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
May 08, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 22, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope # 15052624: Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Motion to file second amended comlplaint has been rejected as a second amended complaint has already been filed on 03/28/24. Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #15052796: Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Motion to file second amended complaint has been rejected: Plaintiff's name in body of motion does not match the title of the motion. Please fix to reflect the correct plaintiff's name. Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Heraldez in Support of Yesenia Robles's Motion for Leave to File SAC |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed Defendant Himnel USA Incorporated's Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff' Yesenia Robles'' First Amended Complaint |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed Defendant Himnel USA Incorporated's Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff' Veronica Hernandez' First Amended Complaint |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed Defendant Himnel USA Incorporated's Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff' Norma Frias' First Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.