Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Musharbash, Joseph, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Calderwood Law Group, against American Medical Response, American Medical Response, Inc., Cutler, M.D, Aaron, Does 2-100, Inclusive, Does 3 -100, Inclusive, (total of 14) See All represented by Bordin Semmer Llp, Davis Grass Goldstein & Finlay, Davis, Grass, Goldstein & Finlay, Leibl Miretsky & Mosely, Llp, The Morrison Law Group, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: February 13, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 05, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 03, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 06, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: January 21, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 13, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 08, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 19, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 27, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Objection Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: August 03, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 03, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 06, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 10, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: December 02, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 22, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 22, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 19, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: April 11, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 13, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 09, 2023Petition Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 27, 2022Stipulation Filed re:
Date: December 06, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 07, 2022Opposition to Petition Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: December 09, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 18, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 21, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 05, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 09, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 31, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: March 21, 2023Declaration re:
Date: December 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Declaration re:
Date: February 22, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 23, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: February 07, 2024Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: October 12, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 07, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 15, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 07, 2024Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: October 20, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 21, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 22, 2022Declaration re:
Date: December 02, 2022Application for Order Filed re:
Date: March 13, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 31, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 11, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 11, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 15, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 10, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 06, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 04, 2023Objection Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 25, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 09, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 11, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: July 03, 2023Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: January 04, 2024Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Notice Sent re:
Date: August 05, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 20, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 10, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 17, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 23, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 22, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 05, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 29, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 21, 2023Answer Filed
Date: December 22, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: October 17, 2022Order signed and Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 10, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Application for Order Filed re:
Date: August 07, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: July 24, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 27, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 05, 2024Notice Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Notice of Lodging of Exhibits
Date: November 29, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 21, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: July 24, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
June 13, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 14, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Non Opposition To The Motion Filed | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Granting Motion for Summary Judgment of Siraj Gibani, MD |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed filed by Defendant |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Matter is called at 8:59 am and there is no appearance or call regarding today's non-appearance by plaintiff or their counsel. |
|
February 07, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Appearance Defendant Atty by Video approved - PLEASE BE 15 MIN EARLY (S14 zoom is always avaialbe) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.