Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mehta, Bhavin, Mehta, Saroj, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Yeroushalmi & Yeroushaimi, against Does 1 Through 75, Inclusive, San Bernardino Villas Lp, represented by La Follette, Johnson, Dehaas, Fesler & Ames, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Saroj Mehta, represented by her attorney-in-fact Bhavin Mehta, against San Bernardino Villas LP dba Villas at San Bernardino and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges elder abuse and neglect, willful misconduct, a...
Order Filed Re:
Date: February 23, 2023Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:
Date: February 23, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional)
Date: June 12, 2023Notice
Date: August 07, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 25, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 15, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: November 22, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 14, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 27, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 08, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: October 07, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 02, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 27, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 09, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 10, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 27, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 11, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: September 09, 2022Court Order Filed
Date: February 01, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Declaration re:
Date: November 10, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Court Order Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Motion to Stay
Date: December 09, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
February 06, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 23, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document(s) received via FileSubmit Suppl minor's comp - intake priority |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Supplemental declaration of Ben Yeroushalmi iso Plaintiff's petition for approval of compromise |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | notice of hearing on plaintiff' petition for approval of compromise | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional) | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Notice of Settlement |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $4.00 visa payment for 1st app fees paid on 7.14.23 |
|
March 08, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.