Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Parafeinik, Oxana, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Se, The Law Office Of Joe Estrada, against Does 1-2, Strong Bridge Management Llc, Voita, Carol, represented by Anderson Mcpharlin & Conners Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Oxana Parafeinik, is suing the defendants, Carol Volta and Carol Voita, who are the sole member and manager of Strong Bridge Management LLC. The complaint d...
Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 19, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 01, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 26, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: March 08, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 15, 2023Notice
Date: June 13, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: March 29, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: December 14, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: December 14, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 25, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 19, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Demurrer to Complaint
Date: July 25, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: October 16, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 14, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: October 17, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 01, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 02, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: September 12, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Vacated Document re:
Date: August 23, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 16, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 20, 2022Motion re:
Date: February 06, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: June 06, 2022Reply Filed
Date: October 05, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 26, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: October 17, 2022Opposition to Petition Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 08, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Certificate & Order Vacating Docs Filed. Ntc Sent to Parties
Date: August 23, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Denied
Date: June 06, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 01, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: November 09, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 10, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: August 19, 2022Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 01, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 07, 2024Proof of Service
Date: November 10, 2022Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 23, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Order signed and filed.
Date: January 25, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: November 22, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: October 28, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 10, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: July 22, 2022Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 15, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Motion Filed
Date: January 20, 2023Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: November 18, 2022Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: August 02, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: February 16, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: July 13, 2023Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: August 26, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Tentative decisions
Date: December 12, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 02, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 23, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 01, 2022Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: August 01, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: August 19, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 15, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: September 02, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 02, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 15, 2022Trial Setting Order filed
Date: March 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 02, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
February 06, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Plaintiff, Oxana Parafeinik, RE: Appointment of Discovery Referee and Related Cost |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Appointing Referee |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Tentative decisions | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Minute Order dated 12/14/23 |
|
December 14, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie Plaintiff's, Oxana Parafeink MTC further responses to special interrogatories, set two propounded by plaintiff Oxana Parafeinka, to defendant Carol Voita |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of plaintiff re: MTC further responses to special interrogatories, set two |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.