Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Novalk, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Tatone Law, Apc, against Cirit, Denis Baran, Cirit, Fatma Handan, Cirit, Semih, C-Tech, Inc, Does 1-100, (total of 9) See All represented by Law Offices Of Edward S Wallace, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph T Ortiz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration ISO Application Filed Electronically
Date: February 15, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 13, 2024Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: February 15, 2024Proof of Service
Date: January 29, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: November 22, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: February 15, 2024Motion re:
Date: November 22, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 15, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: February 15, 2024Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: February 15, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 29, 2024Notice
Date: November 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 24, 2021Objection Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 24, 2021Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 24, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 07, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Memorandum Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 20, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 24, 2021Declaration re:
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration re:
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 24, 2021Declaration re:
Date: July 06, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: August 17, 2022Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: September 13, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: October 18, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 06, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 06, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 06, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 06, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 06, 2022Motion to Set Aside
Date: February 17, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 28, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 20, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 06, 2022Reply Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 24, 2021Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Reply Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 17, 2022Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 28, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: February 01, 2022Declaration re:
Date: February 17, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 03, 2022Declaration re:
Date: February 17, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: April 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
August 01, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
May 21, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
February 22, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration ISO Application Filed Electronically DECLARATION OF MICHELANGLEO TATONE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NOVALK, LLC MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SPECIFIED IN THE DEPOSITION NOTICE TO DEFENDANT SEMIH CIRIT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel further responses to RFPD def Semih Cirit | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Michelangelo ISO Novalk, LLC's |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF NOVALK, LLC S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SPECIFIED IN THE DEPOSITION NOTICE TO DEFENDANT C-TECH, INC. AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.