Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Rowan, Sandra, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices, Apc, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, General Motors Llc, represented by Erskine Law Group, Apc, Erskine Law Group, Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, Sandra Rowan, is suing General Motors LLC and individuals identified as Does 1 through 10 for violation of statutory o...
Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 02, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 16, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 04, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 28, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 27, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 15, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
March 05, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
November 06, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) (Notices) | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: PLA MIL#1 TO EXCLUDE SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Filed | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: PLA MIL#8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING DEF 998 STATUTORY OFFER TO COMPROMISE |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: PLA MIL#4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR ARGUEMENT REFERRING OR RELATING TO PLA APPLICATION FOR FINANCING AND FINACIAL CONDITION |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: PLA MIL#3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING OR RELATING TO ATTY'S FEES AND LITIGATION COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.