Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Sanchez, Simon, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mcfarlin Llp, against Does 1-100, Inclusive, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mtc Financial Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., represented by Wright, Finlay & Zak, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 28, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 28, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 26, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Demurrer Filed
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 27, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Demurrer Filed
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Declaration of Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: December 23, 2021Order Granting Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: February 10, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 18, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.