Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
City Of Ontario, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Best Best & Krieger, Law Offices Of Charisse L. Smith, against Does 1 Through 25, Mondragon, Carlos Ronces, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., represented by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, Llp, Law Offices Of Andres Bustamante, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tony Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the City of Ontario in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, City of Ontario, is a municipal corporation. The defendants named in the complaint are Carlos Ronces Mondrag...
Motion re:
Date: May 19, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Copy of Undertaking Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: May 19, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: May 19, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: May 19, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Answer Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 29, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 14, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: July 11, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Answer Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 18, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 04, 2021Response to Motion (Opposition)
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 12, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 03, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Reply Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Notice
Date: June 13, 2022Motion re:
Date: May 18, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: May 19, 2021Declaration re:
Date: May 18, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: May 25, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 03, 2021Declaration re:
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Service
Date: August 24, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: March 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Electronic Service
Date: March 23, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Status Report Filed
Date: August 24, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.