Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Cunha, Arthur Joseph, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Andrade Gonzalez Llp, against Chaffey Joint Union High School District, represented by Mccune & Harber, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Arthur Joseph Cunha against Chaffey Joint Union High School District and other defendants. The complaint alleges negligence and dangerous condition of public property as causes of action. The incident in qu...
Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 30, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: January 11, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: December 05, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: July 08, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 16, 2022Evidence re:
Date: March 29, 2022Motion to Compel Requests for Admissions
Date: December 05, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 24, 2022Objection Filed
Date: September 16, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: October 26, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 25, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 26, 2023Motion re:
Date: December 02, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: October 18, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 29, 2022Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: September 30, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: September 30, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 30, 2020Notice
Date: January 12, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: March 29, 2022Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Evidence re:
Date: September 08, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 08, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 14, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 22, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 02, 2024Ex Parte Application
Date: July 07, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 08, 2022Reply Filed
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order Electronically filed
Date: January 11, 2024Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 08, 2022Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 31, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 20, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: February 27, 2024Notice Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 25, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: February 27, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 31, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Answer Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 25, 2022Notice
Date: February 16, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 10, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 11, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
April 25, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OFF CALENDAR |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF S MOTIONS TO COMPEL OFF- CALENDAR FOR PLAINTIFF ARTHUR J. CUNHA |
|
April 15, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed | |
February 27, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.